EP1479780 - A novel design of probes for saccharomyces cerevisiae which minimizes cross-hybridization, the obtained probes and diagnostic uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25/28, rue du Docteur Roux 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université Pierre et Marie Curie 4 Place Jussieu 75252 Paris Cedex 05 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25/28, rue du Docteur Roux 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE PIERRE ET MARIE CURIE 4, place Jussieu 75252 Paris Cédex 05 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Talla, Emmanuel 36, avenue de la Résistance 93100 Montreuil / FR | 02 /
Tekaia, Fredj 24, promenade du Pavé Lory 77600 Bussy Saint Georges / FR | 03 /
Dujon, Bernard 6, rue de la Gruerie 91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 1083 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 03447119.3 | 22.05.2003 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1479780 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6895 (EP);
C12Q1/6837 (EP);
C12Q2600/158 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6837, C12Q2541/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Title | German: | Neues Entwurfsverfahren für Saccharomyces Cerevisiae Sonden, welches die Kreuzhybridisierung minimiert, die erhaltenen Sonden, und deren diagnostische Verwendungen | [2004/48] | English: | A novel design of probes for saccharomyces cerevisiae which minimizes cross-hybridization, the obtained probes and diagnostic uses thereof | [2004/48] | French: | Nouveau procédé de conception de sondes pour saccharomyces cérévisiae minimisant l'hybridation croisée, les sondes obtenues, et leurs utilisations diagnostiques | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 11.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 24.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2007 | Request for decision received: Request for further processing | 05.03.2008 | Result of request for decision (Request for further processing): Request rejected | 18.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/38] | Appeal following examination | 18.04.2008 | Appeal received No. J0013/08 | 20.06.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | Divisional application(s) | EP06116236.8 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 29.07.2006 | EP06121375.7 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 27.09.2006 | Request for further processing for: | 10.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 10.10.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0799897 (AFFYMETRIX INC [US]) [Y] 1-13,17 * page 8, line 55 - page 12, line 55 * * page 1 - page 4 *; | [Y]WO0106013 (ROSETTA INPHARMATICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-13,17 * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO0159151 (TM BIOSCIENCE CORP [CA], et al) [Y] 1-13,17 * page 16 - page 37 *; | [X] - XU DONG ET AL, "PRIMEGENS: Robust and efficient design of gene-specific probes for microarray analysis.", BIOINFORMATICS (OXFORD), (200211), vol. 18, no. 11, ISSN 1367-4803, pages 1432 - 1437, XP002260420 [X] 1-13,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/18.11.1432 | [X] - TEN BOSCH JOHN ET AL, "Validation of sequence optimized 70 base pair oligonucleotides for use on DNA microarrays", INTERNATIONAL GENOME SEQUENCING AND ANALYSIS CONFERENCE, 12th International Genome Sequencing and Analysis Conference;Miami Beach, Florida, USA; September 12-15, 2000, (2000), vol. 12, page 88, XP002184313 [X] 1-13,17 * abstract * | [X] - LI FUGEN ET AL, "Selection of optimal DNA oligos for gene expression arrays", BIOINFORMATICS (OXFORD), (200111), vol. 17, no. 11, ISSN 1367-4803, pages 1067 - 1076, XP001062521 [X] 1-13,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/17.11.1067 | [DX] - HUGHES T R ET AL, "Expression profiling using microarrays fabricated by an ink-jet oligonucleotide synthesizer", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING, US, (200104), vol. 19, no. 4, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 342 - 347, XP002230790 [DX] 1-13,17 * Abstract. Experimental protocol, oligonucleotide selection. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/86730 | [DX] - ROUILLARD JEAN-MARIE ET AL, "OligoArray: genome-scale oligonucleotide design for microarrays.", BIOINFORMATICS (OXFORD, ENGLAND) ENGLAND MAR 2002, (200203), vol. 18, no. 3, ISSN 1367-4803, pages 486 - 487, XP002260421 [DX] 1-13,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/18.3.486 | [DX] - NIELSEN H B ET AL, "Avoiding cross hybridization by choosing nonredundant targets on cDNA arrays.", BIOINFORMATICS (OXFORD, ENGLAND) ENGLAND FEB 2002, (200202), vol. 18, no. 2, ISSN 1367-4803, pages 321 - 322, XP002260422 [DX] 1-13,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/18.2.321 | [Y] - LASHKARI D A ET AL, "Yeast mmicroarrays for genome wide parallel genetic and gene expression analysis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199711), vol. 94, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 13057 - 13062, XP002115013 [Y] 1-13,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.24.13057 | [Y] - CHO ET AL, "PARALLEL ANALYSIS OF GENETIC SELECTIONS USING WHOLE GENOME OLIGONUCLEOTIDE ARRAYS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199803), vol. 95, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3752 - 3757, XP002100299 [Y] 1-13,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.7.3752 | [Y] - TOMIUK S ET AL, "Microarray probe selection strategies.", BRIEFINGS IN BIOINFORMATICS ENGLAND DEC 2001, (200112), vol. 2, no. 4, ISSN 1467-5463, pages 329 - 340, XP002260423 [Y] 1-13,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bib/2.4.329 | [T] - HAAS STEFAN A ET AL, "Genome-scale design of PCR primers and long oligomers for DNA microarrays.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH. ENGLAND 1 OCT 2003, (20031001), vol. 31, no. 19, ISSN 1362-4962, pages 5576 - 5581, XP002260424 [T] 1-13,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkg752 |