EP1419854 - Control piece and distributor for abrasive material feeding into a machine with a throwing wheel and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RUTTEN S.A. Parc Industriel des Hauts Sarts Première Avenue 123-125 B-4040 Herstal / BE | [2006/47] |
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states RUTTEN S.A. Parc Industriel des Hauts Sarts Première Avenue 123-125 B-4040 Herstal / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rutten, Léon Allée des Sorbiers 18 4671 Housse (Blégny) / BE | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Powis de Tenbossche, Roland, et al Cabinet Bede S.A. Boulevard Général Wahis 15 1030 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Powis de Tenbossche, Roland, et al Cabinet Bede S.A. Boulevard Général Wahis 15 1030 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2004/21] | Powis de Tenbossche, Roland, et al Cabinet Bede Boulevard Lambermont, 140 1030 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 03447269.6 | 30.10.2003 | [2004/21] | Priority number, date | BE20020000628 | 04.11.2002 Original published format: BE 200200628 | [2004/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1419854 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1419854 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B24C5/06 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
B24C5/068 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/21] | Title | German: | Kontrollstück und Verteiler zur Materialzuführung zur Sandstrahlanlage mit Schleuderrad und dessen Anwendung | [2004/21] | English: | Control piece and distributor for abrasive material feeding into a machine with a throwing wheel and its use | [2004/21] | French: | Pièce de contrôle et distributeur pour alimentation de turbine de grenaillage centrifuge et leur utilisation | [2004/21] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 14.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 14.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2006 | CY | 22.11.2006 | CZ | 22.11.2006 | EE | 22.11.2006 | FI | 22.11.2006 | IE | 22.11.2006 | RO | 22.11.2006 | SI | 22.11.2006 | SK | 22.11.2006 | TR | 22.11.2006 | BG | 22.02.2007 | DK | 22.02.2007 | GR | 23.02.2007 | ES | 05.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | HU | 23.05.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CY | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
BG | 22.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2285938 (PHILIPPSON ANTHONY PATRICK [GB]) [A] 1-23* abstract * |