EP1468271 - METHOD FOR MONITORING AND CONTROLLING THE HIGH TEMPERATURE REDUCING COMBUSTION ATMOSPHERE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states L'Air Liquide S. A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON DRASEK, William, A. 17083 Bonnie Trail East Oak Forest, IL 60452 / US | 02 /
WEHE, Shawn, D. 39A Groton Road Shirley, MA 01864 / US | 03 /
ALLEN, Mark, G. 113 Appleton Street, 1 Boston, MA 02116 / US | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Vesin, Jacques L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Vesin, Jacques L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A., Service Propriété Industrielle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03700067.6 | 13.01.2003 | [2004/43] | WO2003IB00102 | Priority number, date | US20020349638P | 17.01.2002 Original published format: US 349638 P | US20020314566 | 09.12.2002 Original published format: US 314566 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03060491 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1468271 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/39, F23N5/00 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
F23N5/082 (EP,US);
G01N21/3504 (EP,US);
G01N21/39 (EP,US);
G01N21/85 (EP,US);
G01N2021/399 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND KONTROLLE DER REDUZIERENDEN HOCHTEMPERATUR-VERBRENNUNGSATMOSPHÄRE | [2004/43] | English: | METHOD FOR MONITORING AND CONTROLLING THE HIGH TEMPERATURE REDUCING COMBUSTION ATMOSPHERE | [2004/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE REGLAGE D'UNE ATMOSPHERE DE COMBUSTION REDUISANT LES HAUTES TEMPERATURES | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 29.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/25] | 15.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0133200 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR], et al) [A] 1,3,5,17,27 * page 17, line 14 - page 19, line 2 * * figure 1 *; | [DA]US5813767 (CALABRO BRUNO [IT], et al) [DA] 1,15,17,25 * column 8, line 8 - line 17 * * column 9, line 27 - line 31 * * column 10, line 12 - line 14 * * figure 2; claim 1 * | [DA] - EBERT V ET AL, "SIMULTANEOUS DIODE-LASER-BASED IN SITU DETECTION OF MULTIPLE SPECIES AND TEMPERATURE IN A GAS-FIRED POWER PLANT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 28TH SYMPOSIUM (INTERNATIONAL) ON COMBUSTION, (2000), pages 423 - 430, XP001148198 [DA] 1,17,27 * page 424, column R, paragraph 2 - page 425, column L, paragraph 2 * * figure 2 * | by applicant | US5984998 | US5813767 | US5832842 | - OKABE,H., PHOTO-CHEMISTRY OF SMALL MOLECULES, NEW YORK, JOHN WILLEY & SONS, (19780101), page 166 | - ALLEN, M.G., "DIODE LASER ABSORPTION SENSORS FOR GAS-DYNAMIC AND COMBUSTIBLE FLOWS", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (19980101), no. 9, page 545-562 | - ALLENDORF, ET AL., "LASER-BASED SENSOR OF OFFGAS COMPOSITION AND TEMPERATURE IN BOF STEELMAKING", IRON AND STEEL ENGINEER, (19980101), no. 74, page 31-35 | - ELBERT, ET AL., "SIMULTANEOUS DIODE-LASER-BASED IN SITU DETECTION OF MULTIPLE SPECIES AND TEMPERATURE IN GAS-FIRED POWER PLANT.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE COMBUSTIBLE INSTITUTE, (20000101), no. 28, page 423-430 | - FURLONG, ET AL., "DIODE-LASER SENSORS FOR REAL-TIME CONTROL OF TEMPERATURE AND H2O IN PULSED COMBUSTION SYSTEMS", 34TH AIAA/ASME/SAE/ASEE JOINT PROPULSION CONFERENCE, (19980101), page AIAA-98-3949 | - UPSCHULTE, ET AL., "IN SITU MULTI-SPECIES COMBUSTION SENSOR USING A MULTI-SECTION", 36TH AEROSPACE SCIENCES MEETING & EXHIBIT, RENO, NV, (19980101), page AIAA 98-0402 | - ROTHMAN, ET AL., "RHE HILTRAN MOLECULAR DATABASE", J.QUANT.SPECTROSC.RADIAT.TRANSFER, (19910101), no. 48, page 469-507 | - UPSCHULTE, ET AL., "DIODE LASER MEASUREMENTS OF LINE STRENGHTS AND SELF-BRIADENING PARAMETERS OF WATER VAPOR BETWEEN 300 AND 1000 K NEAR 1.31 uM", J.QUANT.SPECTROSC.RADIAT.TRANSFER, (19980101), no. 59,6, page 653-670 | - VON DRASEK, ET AL., "MULTI-FONCTIONAL INDUSTRIAL COMBUSTION PROCESS MONITORING WITH TUNABLE DIODE LASERS.", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (20000101), no. 4201 | US19610102940 |