EP1468311 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING SEISMIC DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
ES
IT
NL
WesternGeco Seismic Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For:AT
ES
IT
NL
WesternGeco Seismic Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
For:FR
SERVICES PETROLIERS SCHLUMBERGER 42, rue Saint-Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2004/43] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
WesternGeco Seismic Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
For:FR
SERVICES PETROLIERS SCHLUMBERGER 42, rue Saint-Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERTSSON, Johan Olof Anders High Cross, Madingley Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB3 0EL / GB | 02 /
MARTIN, James Edward Sandviksveien 93A N-1363 H vik / NO | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Suckling, Andrew Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Suckling, Andrew Michael Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford, Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03700139.3 | 09.01.2003 | [2004/43] | WO2003GB00050 | Priority number, date | GB20020000559 | 11.01.2002 Original published format: GB 0200559 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03058280 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1468311 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/36 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
G01V1/3808 (EP,US);
G01V1/364 (EP,US);
G01V2210/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE UND APPARAT ZUR SEISMISCHEN DATENVERARBEITUNG | [2004/43] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING SEISMIC DATA | [2004/43] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES SISMIQUES | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 28.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/03] | 02.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5191557 (RECTOR JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * column 10, line 30 - line 42 *; | [XD]WO0153854 (SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS [CA], et al) [XD] 1-23 * page 7, line 4 - line 8 * * claims 1,2,9,13 *; | [XD] - AMUNDSEN L, "WAVENUMBER-BASED FILTERING OF MARINE POINT-SOURCE DATA", GEOPHYSICS, SOCIETY OF EXPLORATION GEOPHYSICISTS. TULSA, US, (19930901), vol. 58, no. 9, ISSN 0016-8033, pages 1335 - 1348, XP000412865 [XD] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1443516 | [XD] - AMUNDSEN L., "Decomposition of multicomponent sea-floor into upgoing and downgoing p- and s- waves", GEOPHYSICS, (1995), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 563 - 572, XP002234805 [XD] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1443794 |