EP1632038 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR TRANSMITTING DATA WITHIN AN OPEN COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Current Communications International Holding GmbH Hintermättlistrasse 1 5506 Mägenwil / CH | [2007/51] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states Ascom Powerline Communications AG Belpstrasse 37 3000 Bern 14 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNN, Andrew Hendschikerstrasse 5 CH-5504 Othmarsingen / CH | 02 /
BRAUN, Walter Winzerstrasse 40 CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | 03 /
LIU, Weilin Erlenstrasse 2 CH-5442 Fislisbach / CH | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Rüfenacht, Philipp Michael, et al Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Rüfenacht, Philipp Michael, et al Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Schmiedenplatz 5 Postfach CH-3000 Bern 7 / CH | Application number, filing date | 03700286.2 | 27.01.2003 | [2006/10] | WO2003CH00060 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004068736 | Date: | 12.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1632038 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/54 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
H04B3/542 (EP);
H04B2203/5408 (EP);
H04B2203/5441 (EP);
H04B2203/5445 (EP);
H04B2203/5491 (EP);
H04J3/0644 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2006/20] |
Former [2006/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN INNERHALB EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSVERBUNDS | [2006/10] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR TRANSMITTING DATA WITHIN AN OPEN COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2006/10] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES AU SEIN D'UNE LIAISON DE COMMUNICATION | [2006/10] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 01.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/04] | 04.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.12.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   12.12.2005 | 12.12.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   12.12.2005 | 12.12.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   12.12.2005 | 12.12.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   12.12.2005 | 12.12.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   12.12.2005 | 12.12.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   12.12.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.12.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   12.12.2005 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.08.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2005 | 31.01.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO0249232 (ASCOM POWERLINE COMM AG ;ALDIS JAMES (CH); LUNN ANDREW (CH); LIU W) [DA] * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 16 * * page 4, line 20 - line 24 * * page 6, line 22 - column 7, line 15 *; | [A]US4419758 (DOREY HOWARD A) [A] * column 2, line 22 - line 38 * * column 7, line 58 - line 64 * * column 9, line 13 - line 32; figure 3 *; | [A]US4514719 (TANAKA OSAMU ET AL) [A] * column A * |