EP1470372 - THERMOACTIVE WALL AND CEILING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zent-Frenger Holding GmbH Schwarzwaldstrasse 2 64646 Heppenheim / DE | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Eidgenössische Materialprüfungs- und Forschungsanstalt Empa Uberlandstrasse 129 8600 Dübendorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSCHENZ, Markus Breitackerstrasse 38 CH-8542 Wiesendangen / CH | 02 /
LEHMANN, Beat Bluemwis 2 CH-8165 Schleinikon / CH | 03 /
HOLST, Stefan Rosenbergstrasse 109 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Schober, Christoph D. Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Schober, Christoph D. Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober, Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/44] | Felber, Josef Felber & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 116 Postfach 105 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 03700304.3 | 03.02.2003 | [2004/44] | WO2003CH00081 | Priority number, date | CH20020017502 | 01.02.2002 Original published format: CH 175022002 | [2004/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03064931 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1470372 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1470372 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/16 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
F24F5/0021 (EP,US);
F24D3/165 (EP,US);
F24F5/0092 (EP,US);
F28D20/023 (EP,US);
F24D11/00 (EP,US);
Y02A30/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOAKTIVES WAND- UND DECKENELEMENT | [2004/44] | English: | THERMOACTIVE WALL AND CEILING ELEMENT | [2004/44] | French: | ELEMENT DE MUR ET DE PLAFOND THERMOACTIF | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 12.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/11] | Request for further processing for: | 19.09.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 19.09.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2007 | Decision despatched | 17.07.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.07.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2006 | 28.02.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.08.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.04.2010 | DK | 07.04.2010 | EE | 07.04.2010 | FI | 07.04.2010 | HU | 07.04.2010 | IE | 07.04.2010 | NL | 07.04.2010 | SE | 07.04.2010 | SI | 07.04.2010 | SK | 07.04.2010 | TR | 07.04.2010 | CY | 14.04.2010 | BG | 07.07.2010 | GR | 08.07.2010 | PT | 09.08.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CZ | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
TR | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CZ | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CZ | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | DK | 07.04.2010 | |
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | DK | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | FI | 07.04.2010 | |
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 07.04.2010 | |
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | FI | 07.04.2010 | |
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | NL | 07.04.2010 | |
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 07.04.2010 | |
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | SI | 07.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH02279926 ; | [A]EP0065679 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE4005915 (KOESTER HELMUT [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]JPH07293908 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]FR2794224 (ACOME SOC COOP TRAVAILLEURS [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910131), vol. 015, no. 042, Database accession no. (M - 1076), & JP02279926 A 19901115 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH07293908 |