EP1463743 - ANHYDRATE/HYDRATE OF AN ERYTHROMYCIN DERIVATIVE AND PROCESSES FOR PREPARING SAID ANHYDRATE/HYDRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMADA, Kenji Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 41-8, Takada 3-cho Toshima-ku, Tokyo 171-8545 / JP | 02 /
HIRAIDE, Akira Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku, Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | 03 /
KOYAMA, Kaichiro Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 55-1, Ukima 5-cho Kita-ku, Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | 04 /
SHIMIZU, Hitoshi Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku, Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | 05 /
WARD, Gary H. Chugai Pharma USA, LLC. 6275, Nancy Ridge Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 06 /
CHERUVALLATH, Vandana K. Chugai Pharma USA, LLC. 6275, Nancy Ridge Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 07 /
PARENT, Stephan 2120 Cumulus Court West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/41] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03701065.9 | 14.01.2003 | [2004/41] | WO2003JP00203 | Priority number, date | JP20020004680 | 11.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002004680 | JP20020076708 | 19.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002076708 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03068793 | Date: | 21.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463743 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/08, A61K31/7048, A61P31/00 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
C07H17/08 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANHYDRAT/HYDRAT VON EINEM ERYTHROMYCINDERIVAT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2004/41] | English: | ANHYDRATE/HYDRATE OF AN ERYTHROMYCIN DERIVATIVE AND PROCESSES FOR PREPARING SAID ANHYDRATE/HYDRATE | [2004/41] | French: | ANHYDRATE/HYDRATE D'UN DERIVE D'ERYTHROMYCINE ET PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE CET ANHYDRATE/HYDRATE | [2004/41] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 03.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/11] | 09.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0643068 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * example 57 *; | [A]EP0846697 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * compound VII * |