EP1481562 - A BATTERY AND INK CHARGING STAND FOR MOBILE COMMUNICATION DEVICE HAVING AN INTERNAL PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVERBROOK, Kia Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd, 393 Darling Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley, 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 03701343.0 | 12.02.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003AU00170 | Priority number, date | AU2002PS00492 | 13.02.2002 Original published format: AU PS049202 | AU2002PS00493 | 13.02.2002 Original published format: AU PS049302 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03069931 | Date: | 21.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1481562 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1481562 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/393 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
B41J3/445 (EP,US);
H02J7/00 (KR);
B41J29/393 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04M1/04 (EP,US);
H04M1/21 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/49] | H04Q7/32, B41J29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIE UND FARBSTOFFLADESTÄNDER FÜR EIN MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄT MIT INTERNEM DRUCKER | [2004/49] | English: | A BATTERY AND INK CHARGING STAND FOR MOBILE COMMUNICATION DEVICE HAVING AN INTERNAL PRINTER | [2004/49] | French: | SUPPORT POUR CHARGEMENT DE BATTERIE ET D'ENCRE UTILISE AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE AYANT UNE IMPRIMANTE INTERNE | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 30.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.03.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | BE | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | CZ | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | EE | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | IT | 18.08.2010 | NL | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | SI | 18.08.2010 | SK | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | BG | 18.11.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | ES | 29.11.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | LU | 12.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
TR | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
LU | 12.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
LU | 12.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 18.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2782231 (SBARRO FRANSCECO [CH]) [A] 1,7-9 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2000341428 (ATLUS CO LTD) [Y] 1,7-9 * abstract *; | [YA]US2001055121 (OMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,7-9 * paragraph [0064]; figures 6,7 * [A] 2-6,10; | [PA]US2002021320 (MIYAZAWA AZUMA [JP]) [PA] 1,7-9 * the whole document *; | [PA]JP2002273862 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [PA] 1,7-9; | [PXA]US2002186293 (ANDO MASAHIRO [JP]) [PX] 1,7-9 [PA] 2-6,10; | [E]US6916128 (PETTERUTI ROBERT [US], et al) [E] 1,7-9 * the whole document *; | [E]FR2892257 (CABROLIER MARIE ANNE LUCIE [FR]) [E] 1,7-9* the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2002273862 ; | [A]US6464317 (MIYAZAWA AZUMA [JP]); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 02, Database accession no. 2003-022505, XP008099838 & JP2002273862 A 20020925 (SEIKO EPSON CORP.) | by applicant | US6213588 | US6213589 | US6231163 | US6244691 | US6247795 | US6257704 | US6277652 | US6394581 |