EP1473611 - LOAD FAILURE DIAGNOSIS METHOD AND APPARATUS AND LOAD FAILURE PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Automotive Systems Corporation 6-7, Shibuya 3-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0002 / JP | [2008/24] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Bosch Automotive Systems Corporation 6-7, Shibuya 3-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUZAKI, H., c/o Bosch Automotive Systems Corp. 13-26, Yakyu-cho 3-chome Higashimatsuyama-shi, Saitama 355-8603 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Y., c/o Bosch Automotive Systems Corp. 13-26, Yakyu-cho 3-chome Higashimatsuyama-shi, Saitama 355-8603 / JP | 03 /
SATO, E., c/o Bosch Automotive Systems Corp. 13-26, Yakyu-cho 3-chome Higashimatsuyama-shi, Saitama 355-8603 / JP | 04 /
KAWANO, T., c/o Bosch Automotive Systems Corp. 13-26, Yakyu-cho 3-chome Higashimatsuyama-shi, Saitama 355-8603 / JP | 05 /
KURIHARA, T., c/o Bosch Automotive Systems Corp. 13-26, Yakyu-cho 3-chome Higashimatsuyama-shi, Saitama 355-8603 / JP | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03701875.1 | 27.01.2003 | [2004/45] | WO2003JP00719 | Priority number, date | JP20020026419 | 04.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002026419 | [2004/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03067349 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1473611 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1473611 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
G05B23/0235 (EP);
G05B23/02 (KR);
G05B11/28 (EP);
G05B9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/24] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASTAUSFALLDIAGNOSEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG UND LASTAUSFALLVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2004/45] | English: | LOAD FAILURE DIAGNOSIS METHOD AND APPARATUS AND LOAD FAILURE PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2004/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DIAGNOSTIC DE DEFAILLANCE DE CHARGE ET PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DEFAILLANCE DE CHARGE | [2004/45] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2004 | Translation filed | 20.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4459819 (HARGRAVES DAVID P [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0240617 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [XA]US5202813 (UOTA KOSAKU [US], et al) [X] 3,4,8 * figure 1 * [A] 1,2,5,7 | International search | [X]JPH0510473 (RINNAI KK); | [X]JPS62279265 (JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYST); | [A]JP2001005521 (NALDEC KK); | [A]JPH02287890 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |