EP1464200 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING COMMUNICATIONS OF DATA FROM MULTIPLE BASE STATIONS TO A MOBILE STATION IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | ||
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHOLMIEH, Aziz 7019 Beagle Street San Diego, CA 92111 / US | 02 /
GAAL, Peter 9515 Easter Way, 6 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
TIEDEMANN, Edward G., Jr. 656 Barretts Mill Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al Tomkins & Co. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 03701980.9 | 03.01.2003 | [2004/41] | WO2003US00136 | Priority number, date | US20020346987P | 08.01.2002 Original published format: US 346987 P | US20020359005P | 20.02.2002 Original published format: US 359005 P | US20020274343 | 18.10.2002 Original published format: US 274343 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03059002 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1464200 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1464200 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/18 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
H04W36/18 (EP,US);
H04L1/0028 (EP,US);
H04L1/0066 (EP,US);
H04W36/302 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70703 (EP,US);
H04B7/022 (EP,US);
H04J13/0048 (EP,US);
H04J13/18 (EP,US);
H04L1/0002 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/41] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DATAKOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNG VON MEHREREN BASISSTATIONEN ZU EINER MOBILSTATION IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2004/41] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING COMMUNICATIONS OF DATA FROM MULTIPLE BASE STATIONS TO A MOBILE STATION IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2004/41] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES A COMMANDER DES COMMUNICATIONS DE DONNEES ENTRE PLUSIEURS STATIONS DE BASE ET UNE STATION MOBILE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION | [2004/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 23.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09173451.7 / EP2139284 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.10.2009 | CY | 28.10.2009 | DK | 28.10.2009 | EE | 28.10.2009 | SI | 28.10.2009 | SK | 28.10.2009 | TR | 28.10.2009 | LU | 03.01.2010 | GR | 29.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | PT | 01.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
LU | 03.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | SI | 28.10.2009 | |
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | PT | 01.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5978365 (YI BYUNG KWAN [US]) |