EP1583486 - STENT WITH VARIABLE STIFFNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIVELLI, Patrick, Jr. 1430 Middlefield Road Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/41] | Schildberg, Peter, et al Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03702131.8 | 15.01.2003 | [2005/41] | WO2003US01215 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004064683 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1583486 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
A61F2/88 (EP,US);
A61F2/9522 (EP,US);
A61F2/9526 (EP,US);
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61F2002/823 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0014 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0018 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0036 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STENT MIT VARIABLER STEIFHEIT | [2005/41] | English: | STENT WITH VARIABLE STIFFNESS | [2005/41] | French: | ENDOPROTHESE A RIGIDITE VARIABLE | [2005/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 08.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/12] | 29.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9315661 (INTERFACE BIOMEDICAL LAB CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,8* figures 2,3 *; | [X]WO0062711 (SMART THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4503569 | US4512338 | US4553545 | US4795485 | US4820298 | US5067957 | US5551954 | US5562641 |