EP1480847 - SEQUENCED PULSE WIDTH MODULATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING AND POWERING A PLURALITY OF DIRECT CURRENT MOTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Railpower Technologies Corp. 202-50 Fell Avenue North Vancouver, British Columbia V7P 3S2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Railpower Technologies Corp. 202-50 Fell Avenue North Vancouver, British Columbia V7P 3S2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONNELLY, Frank, Wegner 509 East 6th Street North Vancouver, British Columbia V7L 1R2 / CA | 02 /
IWAN, Brian, Gulayets 5370 Carson Street Burnaby, British Columbia V5J 2Z2 / CA | [2005/12] |
Former [2004/49] | 01 /
DONNELLY, Frank, Wegner 509 East 6th Street North Vancouver, Britisth Columbia V5J 2 / CA | ||
02 /
IWAN, Brian, Gulayets 5370 Carson Street Burnaby, British Columbia V5J 2Z2 / CA | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03702253.0 | 24.02.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003CA00261 | Priority number, date | US20020083587 | 27.02.2002 Original published format: US 83587 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03072388 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1480847 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60L9/02, H02P7/68 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
B60L3/102 (EP,US);
B60L9/02 (EP,US);
B61C15/12 (EP,US);
H02P5/68 (EP,US);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEQUENZIERTES PULSWEITENMODULATIONSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG UND STROMVERSORGUNG EINER ANZAHL VON GLEICHSTROMMOTOREN | [2004/49] | English: | SEQUENCED PULSE WIDTH MODULATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING AND POWERING A PLURALITY OF DIRECT CURRENT MOTORS | [2004/49] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MODULATION D'IMPULSIONS EN DUREE SEQUENCEE DESTINES A COMMANDER ET A ALIMENTER UNE PLURALITE DE MOTEURS A COURANT DIRECT | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 28.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 01.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/09] | Request for further processing for: | 12.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.11.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4369397 (READ GRAHAM L [AU]) [A] 1-19* abstract *; | [A]US4644232 (NOJIRI YUUKOU [JP], et al) [A] 2,7 * abstract *; | [XA]US6308639 (DONNELLY FRANK WEGNER [CA], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,7 | Examination | GB1239665 |