EP1478301 - BONE PREPARATION TOOL ESPECIALLY USEFUL IN DENTISTRY AND DEVICE FOR THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/48] | OSTEOTOME AND DEVICE FOR THE USE THEREOF | ||
[2009/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arsline S.A. Via al Colle, 8 6833 Vacallo / CH | [2004/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURRI, Achille Via Vacallo 10d CH-6834 Morbio Inferiore / CH | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Störzbach, Michael Andreas Ammann Patentanwälte AG Bern Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Störzbach, Michael Andreas Ammann Patentanwälte AG Bern Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | ||
Former [2004/48] | Störzbach, Michael Andreas Ammann Patentanwälte AG Bern Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 03702268.8 | 27.02.2003 | [2004/48] | WO2003CH00145 | Priority number, date | CH20020034002 | 27.02.2002 Original published format: CH 340022002 | [2004/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03071978 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1478301 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1478301 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/15] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1478301 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | [2010/30] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1478301 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, A61C1/14, A61B17/16 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
A61C1/142 (EP,US);
A61B17/1624 (EP,US);
A61B17/1673 (EP,US);
A61C1/148 (EP,US);
A61C8/0089 (EP,US);
A61B17/1604 (EP,US);
A61B17/1688 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSTRUMENT ZUR VORBEREITUNG VON KNOCHENMATERIAL, VERWENDBAR INSBESONDERE IN DER ZAHNTECHNIK UND VORRICHTUNG ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG | [2004/48] | English: | BONE PREPARATION TOOL ESPECIALLY USEFUL IN DENTISTRY AND DEVICE FOR THE USE THEREOF | [2009/42] | French: | OUTIL DE PREPARATION OSSEUSE UTILISABLE NOTAMMENT EN MEDECINE DENTAIRE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE | [2010/23] |
Former [2004/48] | OSTEOTOME AND DEVICE FOR THE USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2004/48] | OUTIL DE PREPARATION OSSEUSE UTILISABLE NOTAMMENT EN MEDICINE DENTAIRE ET DISPO SITIF POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 14.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.01.2008 | 10.01.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 26.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 06.03.2008 | Appeal received No. T0868/08 | 26.06.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.09.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.04.2010 | EE | 14.04.2010 | IE | 14.04.2010 | SI | 14.04.2010 | TR | 14.04.2010 | GR | 15.07.2010 | PT | 16.08.2010 | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/08] | CY | 14.04.2010 | |
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 14.04.2010 | |
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CY | 14.04.2010 | |
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | SI | 14.04.2010 | |
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | SI | 14.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]CH410276 (STRAUMANN INST AG [CH]) [X] 23,30,32,34* page 1, lines 1-16,67 - page 2, line 16; figure 2 *; | [XA]DE4316955 (KRUPP MEDIZINTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,10,11,16-19 * column 1, lines 27-32 * * column 2, lines 14-17,37-68; figures 1,2 * [A] 5,14; | [XA]US5437675 (WILSON FRANKLIN D [US]) [X] 1,4,9,13,14 * column 3, lines 28-34; figure 1 * [A] 3,5; | [DXA]DE19732983 (FRIATEC AG [DE]) [DX] 1,2,4,8 * figure 7 * [A] 5,7; | [XA]US6171312 (BEATY KEITH D [US]) [X] 23-27 * column 13, lines 17-34; figures 6,9 * [A] 1,2; | [X]WO0185051 (NOBEL BIOCARE AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,16,17,21,22 * figure 6 * |