EP1494366 - POWER CONTROL METHOD FOR UPLINK CONTROL CHANNEL IN SOFT HANDOVER IN HIGH-SPEED PACKET ACCESS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/01] | POWER CONTROL METHOD FOR UPLINK CONTROL CHANNEL IN SOFT HANDOVER IN HIGH-SPEED POCKET ACCESS SYSTEM | ||
[2006/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Service Centre Building Kefa Road Science-Based Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department, Huawei Service Centre Bld., Kefa Road, Science-Based Industrial Park Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department, Huawei Service Centre Bld., Kefa Road, Science-Based Industrial Park Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Di, I. P. D., Huawei Service Centre Bldg Kefa Road, Science-Based Industrial Park Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
WEI, Yuejun, IP Dept., Huawei Service Centre Bldg. Kefa Road, Science-Based Industrial Park Shenzhen, Guangdong Province 518057 / CN | [2005/10] |
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
WU, Di, I. P. D., Huawei Service Centre Bldg Kefa Road, Science-Based Industrial Park Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
02 /
WEI, Yuejun, I. P. D, Huawe Service Centre Bldg. Kefa Road, Science-Based Industrial Park Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Reyier, Ann-Mari Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB, Box 128 721 05 Västeras / SE | Application number, filing date | 03702305.8 | 27.01.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003CN00078 | Priority number, date | CN2002116552 | 08.04.2002 Original published format: CN 02116552 | [2005/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03088519 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494366 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494366 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
H04W52/325 (EP);
H04W52/286 (EP);
H04W52/146 (EP);
H04W52/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSREGELVERFAHREN FÜR DEN AUFWÄRTSSTEUERKANAL BEI DER SOFT-WEITERREICHUNG IN EINEM SCHNELLEN PACKET-ACCESS-SYSTEM | [2006/39] | English: | POWER CONTROL METHOD FOR UPLINK CONTROL CHANNEL IN SOFT HANDOVER IN HIGH-SPEED PACKET ACCESS SYSTEM | [2006/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE DESTINE A UN CANAL DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON MONTANTE DANS UN TRANSFERT SOUPLE, DANS UN SYSTEME D'ACCES PAR PAQUETS EN LIAISON DESCENDANTE A HAUT DEBIT | [2005/01] |
Former [2005/01] | LEISTUNGSREGELVERFAHREN FÜR DEN AUFWÄRTSSTEUERKANAL BEI DER SOFT-WEITERREICHUNG IN EINEM SCHNELLEN POCKET-ACCESS-SYSTEM | ||
Former [2005/01] | POWER CONTROL METHOD FOR UPLINK CONTROL CHANNEL IN SOFT HANDOVER IN HIGH-SPEED POCKET ACCESS SYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2004 | Translation filed | 29.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 05.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.03.2007 | BE | 14.03.2007 | CH | 14.03.2007 | CY | 14.03.2007 | CZ | 14.03.2007 | DK | 14.03.2007 | EE | 14.03.2007 | IT | 14.03.2007 | LI | 14.03.2007 | NL | 14.03.2007 | SI | 14.03.2007 | SK | 14.03.2007 | TR | 14.03.2007 | BG | 14.06.2007 | SE | 14.06.2007 | DE | 15.06.2007 | GR | 15.06.2007 | ES | 25.06.2007 | PT | 14.08.2007 | HU | 15.09.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CY | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
BG | 14.06.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
DE | 15.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
HU | 15.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CY | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
BG | 14.06.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
DE | 15.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CY | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
DE | 15.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
DE | 15.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
DE | 15.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
DE | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CH | 14.03.2007 | |
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - PHILIPS, "Performance of ACK/NACK signalling", TSG RAN WG1 #22, Jeju, South Korea, (20011119), pages 1 - 7, XP002380346 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - "UL Power Control for HSDPA", 3GPP TSG RAN WG 1, (20011119), no. 22, pages 1 - 4, XP002229769 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - CWTS/HUAWEI, "Power Control of Uplink ACK/NACK in Soft Handover", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #24, Orlando, USA, (20020218), no. R1-02-0215, pages 1 - 5, XP002380347 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - "High Speed Downlink Packet Access: Physical Layer Aspects (Release 5)", 3GPP TR 25.858 V5.0.0, XX, XX, (200203), pages 1 - 31, XP002265002 [A] 1-5 * page 19 - page 20 * | [A] - NOKIA, "Power offset for uplink ACK/NACK", TSG-RAN WG1 #23, Espoo, Finland, (20020108), pages 1 - 3, XP002380348 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - NORTEL NETWORKS, "Introduction of power control aspects for HSDPA feature in TS25.214", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 MEETING #24, Orlando, USA, (20020218), pages 1 - 20, XP002380349 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO9937111 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP], et al); | [A]WO9953630 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]WO0131824 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]JP2001128219 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC) |