EP1469745 - USE OF MULTI-LAYER PIGMENTS IN THE FOOD AND PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWEINFURTH, Ralf Gervinusstrasse 59 64287 Darmstadt / DE | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/52] | Application number, filing date | 03702387.6 | 07.01.2003 | [2004/44] | WO2003EP00044 | Priority number, date | DE2002104336 | 01.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10204336 | [2004/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03063616 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1469745 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1469745 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/275, C08K7/00, C09B67/00, A61K47/48 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
A61K9/2813 (EP,KR,US);
C09B67/00 (KR);
A23L5/42 (EP,US);
A61K47/50 (KR);
C09B67/0033 (KR);
C09C1/0024 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON MEHRSCHICHTPIGMENTEN IM LEBENSMITTEL UND PHARMABEREICH | [2004/44] | English: | USE OF MULTI-LAYER PIGMENTS IN THE FOOD AND PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRY | [2004/44] | French: | UTILISATION DE PIGMENTS MULTICOUCHE DANS LE DOMAINE ALIMENTAIRE ET PHARMACEUTIQUE | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 09.01.2008 | Observations by third parties | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 09.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.01.2003 | CY | 28.12.2011 | CZ | 28.12.2011 | DK | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | FI | 28.12.2011 | IE | 28.12.2011 | NL | 28.12.2011 | SE | 28.12.2011 | SI | 28.12.2011 | SK | 28.12.2011 | TR | 28.12.2011 | AT | 07.01.2012 | LU | 07.01.2012 | BE | 31.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | BG | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.03.2012 | PT | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
AT | 07.01.2012 | ||
LU | 07.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
AT | 07.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/31] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
AT | 07.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | SE | 28.12.2011 | |
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3087828 (LINTON HOWARD R) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 57 *; | [A]US4552593 (OSTERTAG WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, lines 18-21 *; | [A]DE19618569 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12* column 5, lines 39-43 *; | [A]DE19638708 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, lines 18-22 *; | [YD]DE19831869 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [YD] 10 * examples 3,4,6 *; | [XY]EP1045014 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * column 1, line 57 - column 3, line 28 * * column 4, lines 12-14,40-48 * * column 5, lines 43-45 * * column 4, lines 41,42 * [Y] 10; | [X]US6334893 (PFAFF GERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,12 * column 1, lines 42-44 * * column 2, lines 1-31,55-67 * * column 3, lines 1-4 * | Examination | WO9961529 | WO03002149 | - EM INDUSTRIES, INC. (NEW YORK), PETITION TO FDA OF APRIL 21, 1998 | - EM INDUSTRIES, INC. (NEW YORK), PETITION TO FDA, JULY 20, 1998 | by applicant | WO9961529 | DE19831869 | EP1045014 | US6334893 | WO03002149 | other | WO9961529 | WO03002149 |