EP1485313 - MODULAR SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR RECEIVING A TRANSFER BRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GD Gép és daru rakodástechnikai gépgyárto és kereskedelmi KFT Kelenvölgyi határsor 5 H-1118 Budapest / HU | [2004/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZABO, Jozsef Erzsébet ut 13 H-2330 Dunaharaszti / HU | 02 /
HEINCZ, Mihály Tuba utca 18 H-1205 Budapest / HU | 03 /
BURIUSZ, Lászlo Fém utca 7. H-2040 Budaörs / HU | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Schnitta, Antal Ménesi ut 4. Budapest 1118 Ungarn / HU | [2004/51] | Application number, filing date | 03702798.4 | 06.02.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003HU00009 | Priority number, date | HU20020000037U | 08.02.2002 Original published format: H U 0200037 U | HU20020000472 | 08.02.2002 Original published format: HU 0200472 | [2006/20] |
Former [2004/51] | HU20020000037 | 08.02.2002 | |
HU20020000472 | 08.02.2002 | Filing language | HU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03066489 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1485313 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65G69/28 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
B65G69/287 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | 03.09.2004 | LT | 03.09.2004 | LV | 03.09.2004 | MK | 03.09.2004 | RO | 03.09.2004 | Title | German: | MODULARE STÜTZKONSTRUKTION ZUR AUFNAHME EINER ÜBERLADEBRÜCKE | [2004/51] | English: | MODULAR SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR RECEIVING A TRANSFER BRIDGE | [2004/51] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SUPPORT MODULAIRE CON UE POUR RECEVOIR UN PON T DE TRANSBORDEMENT | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2003 | Translation filed | 03.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 13.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/35] | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE29803587U (HOCHTIEF FERTIGTEILBAU GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 28; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE29806502U (KIMMEL HUBERT DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1* page 2, line 1 - line 6; figure 2 * | by applicant | DE3310278 | DE9401242U | DE29803587U |