EP1492443 - A DETECTION AND ALARM SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
LI
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
LI
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REITER, Harald c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VOGTMEIER, Gereon c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
LAUTER, Josef c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
SUCH, Olaf c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
REICHINGER, Christian c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
SCHMIDT, Ralf c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03702978.2 | 06.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003IB00842 | Priority number, date | EP20020076227 | 29.03.2002 Original published format: EP 02076227 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03082093 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1492443 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, A61B5/00, A61N1/39 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
A61B5/6804 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (EP,US);
G16H20/30 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0271 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DETEKTIONS- UND ALARMSYSTEM | [2005/01] | English: | A DETECTION AND ALARM SYSTEM | [2005/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE DETECTION ET D'ALARME | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/28] | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5729203 (OKA TOHRU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * column 4, line 40 - line 54 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 13 * [Y] 3; | [YA]US5692215 (KUTZIK DAVID M [US], et al) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 10 - line 28; figure 1 * [A] 1,2; | [X]US6287252 (LUGO MICHAEL V [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 10, line 17 - line 54; figure 1 * | Examination | US2002013538 | by applicant | US5729203 | US5692215 |