EP1481771 - METHOD OF ESTIMATING FLOOR REACTION OF BIPEDAL MOVABLE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2009/17] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAI, Masakazu KABUSHIKI KAISHA HONDA GIJYUTSU KENKSYUSHO 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
IKEUCHI, Yasushi KABUSHIKI KAISHA HONDA GIJYUTSU KENKSYUSHO 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2009/17] |
Former [2004/49] | 01 /
KAWAI, Masakazu KABUSHIKI KAISHA HONDA GIJYUTSU KENKYUSO 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | ||
02 /
IKEUCHI, Yasushi KABUSHIKI KAISHA HONDA GIJYUTSU KANKUSHO 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Hague, Alison Jane Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Hague, Alison Jane Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03703015.2 | 22.01.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003JP00533 | Priority number, date | JP20020018789 | 28.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002018789 | [2004/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03064117 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1481771 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1481771 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B25J5/00, B62D57/032 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
B25J13/085 (EP,US);
B25J13/088 (EP,US);
B62D57/032 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/49] | B25J5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/17] |
Former [2004/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABSCHÄTZUNG VON BODENREAKTION VON ZWEIBEINIGEN BEWEGLICHEN KÖRPERN | [2004/49] | English: | METHOD OF ESTIMATING FLOOR REACTION OF BIPEDAL MOVABLE BODY | [2004/49] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ESTIMER LA REACTION AU SOL D'UN CORPS BIPEDE EN MOUVEMENT | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2004 | Translation filed | 24.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/13] | Request for further processing for: | 20.09.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 20.09.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.11.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1120203 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5* figures 1-44; claims 1,8-13 *; | [ED]EP1415770 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [ED] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1424172 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2001138271 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2001347476 (SONY CORP) |