EP1478345 - NOVEL PHARMACEUTICAL DOSAGE FORMS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US | ||
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza, P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARKE, Allan, J. 1250 South Collegeville Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ralph Francis GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Walker, Ralph Francis, Dr. GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 03703679.5 | 03.01.2003 | [2004/48] | WO2003US00099 | Priority number, date | US20020345526P | 03.01.2002 Original published format: US 345526 P | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03057197 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1478345 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
A61J3/10 (EP,US);
A61K9/2095 (EP,US);
A61J2200/20 (EP,US);
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K9/0065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 26.07.2004 | LV | 26.07.2004 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 26.07.2004 | Title | German: | NEUE PHARMAZEUTISCHE DOSIERFORMEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2004/48] | English: | NOVEL PHARMACEUTICAL DOSAGE FORMS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2004/48] | French: | NOUVELLES FORMES POSOLOGIQUES PHARMACEUTIQUES ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CES FORMES POSOLOGIQUES | [2004/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 30.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/08] | 13.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0240904 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-47 * page 2, line 32 - line 45 * * page 5, line 9 - line 11 * * example - * * claim - *; | [XDI]EP0717988 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [XD] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11-16,18,19,22,23,25,26,29-32,34,36-38 * page 2, line 51 - page 3, line 5 * * page 5, line 34 - line 43 * * page 6, line 55 - page 7, line 31 * * example - * * claim - * [I] 1-38; | [I]WO9906038 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-18 * page 2, line 5 - line 42 * * page 4, line 14 - line 29 * * example - ** claim - *; | [XDYI]US6150424 (BREITENBACH JOERG [DE], et al) [XD] 1,2,13-16,18 * column 1, line 26 - line 37 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 25 * * column 3, line 26 - line 56 * * column 4, line 18 - column 6, line 28 * * example - * * claim - * [Y] 1-47 [I] 1-18 | International search | [X]US5766623 (AYRES JAMES W [US], et al); | [Y]US5034171 (KICZEK EDWARD F [US], et al) |