EP1458745 - SUBSTITUTED AMINO CARBOXAMIDES FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 7000 Portage Road Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 7000 Portage Road Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | |||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | |||
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, MI 49007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAGODZINSKA, Barbara 1485 Kentfield Avenue Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 02 /
WARPEHOSKI, Martha, A. 7600 Curry Lane Portage, MI 49024 / US | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Nargolwalla, Cyra Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | Nargolwalla, Cyra Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03703711.6 | 06.01.2003 | [2004/39] | WO2003US00326 | Priority number, date | US20020345316P | 04.01.2002 Original published format: US 345316 P | US20020350419P | 18.01.2002 Original published format: US 350419 P | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03057721 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1458745 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/062, C07C237/06, A61K38/05, A61K31/198, A61P25/28 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07C237/06 (EP,US);
C07K5/06026 (EP,US);
C07K5/06191 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/39] | Extension states | AL | 08.07.2004 | LT | 08.07.2004 | LV | 08.07.2004 | MK | 08.07.2004 | RO | 08.07.2004 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE AMINOCARBOXAMIDE ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER ALZHEIMERSCHEN KRANKHEIT | [2004/39] | English: | SUBSTITUTED AMINO CARBOXAMIDES FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE | [2004/39] | French: | AMINO CARBOXAMIDES SUBSTITUES DESTINES AU TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 08.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/50] | 21.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0077030 (ELAN PHARM INC [US]) [A] 7-10,13-15 * the whole document * |