EP1465862 - CYCLOALKYL KETOAMIDES DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS CATHEPSIN K INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Corporation One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CATALANO, John, George, GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, P.O. Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 02 /
DEATON, David, Norman, GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, P.O. Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Aaron, Bayne, GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, P.O. Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 04 /
TAVARES, Francis, Xavier, GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, P.O. Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Cooke, Tracey GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Cooke, Tracey (GB) GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road GB-Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 03703836.1 | 15.01.2003 | [2004/42] | WO2003US01271 | Priority number, date | US20020349812P | 17.01.2002 Original published format: US 349812 P | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03062192 | Date: | 31.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1465862 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C271/34, C07C271/22, C07D295/20, C07D213/30, C07C275/14, C07D231/38, C07D231/56, C07D213/40, C07D277/66, C07D277/22, C07D263/58, C07D285/08, C07D239/46, C07D495/04, C07D239/34 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
C07D213/30 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C271/22 (EP,US);
C07C271/34 (EP,US);
C07C275/16 (EP,US);
C07D213/40 (EP,US);
C07D231/40 (EP,US);
C07D233/84 (EP,US);
C07D237/14 (EP,US);
C07D239/34 (EP,US);
C07D239/38 (EP,US);
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
C07D263/58 (EP,US);
C07D277/24 (EP,US);
C07D277/34 (EP,US);
C07D285/08 (EP,US);
C07D295/215 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,US);
C07C2601/04 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 09.07.2004 | LV | 09.07.2004 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 09.07.2004 | Title | German: | CYCLOALKYL-KETOAMIDEN DERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS CATHEPSIN-K-INHIBITOREN | [2004/42] | English: | CYCLOALKYL KETOAMIDES DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS CATHEPSIN K INHIBITORS | [2004/42] | French: | DERIVES DE CETOAMIDES A SUBSTITUTION CYCLOALKYLE, UTILES COMME INHIBITEURS DE CATHEPSINE K | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 01.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/04] | 06.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9616079 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-52 * page 58 - page 62; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9212140 (GEORGIA TECH RES INST [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A] - LALONDE J M ET AL, "USE A PAPAIN AS A MODEL FOR THE STRUCTURE-BASED DESIGN OF CATHEPSIN K INHIBITORS: CRYSTAL STRUCTURES OF TWO PAPAIN-INHIBITOR COMPLEXES DEMONSTRATE BINDING TO S-SUBSITES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1998), vol. 41, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4567 - 4576, XP001041629 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm980249f |