EP1469909 - APPARATUS FOR SHUNTING INDUCED CURRENTS IN AN ELECTRICAL LEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/44] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SHUNTING INDUCED CURRENTS IN AN ELECTRICAL LEAD | ||
[2009/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. LC 340, 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REINKE, James, D. 7731 Ranchview Lane Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | 02 /
WILKINSON, Jeffrey, D. 459 Colleen Drive Vadnais Heights, MN 55127 / US | 03 /
KALIN, Ron 8909 48th Avenue North New Hope, MN 55428-4421 / US | 04 /
FOERSTER, Laurie, D. 4645 Island View Drive Mound, MN 55364 / US | 05 /
ZEIJEMAKER, Volkert, A. Wachtendorkstr 22 NL-6371 VW Landgraaf / NL | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03704023.5 | 27.01.2003 | [2004/44] | WO2003US02309 | Priority number, date | US20020059601 | 29.01.2002 Original published format: US 59601 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03063953 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1469909 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1469909 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
A61N1/056 (EP,US);
A61N1/086 (EP,US);
A61N1/3718 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL, SE [2009/34] |
Former [2004/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON WIRBELSTRÖMEN IN EINER ELEKTRISCHEN LEITUNG MITTELS EINES SHUNTS | [2009/15] | English: | APPARATUS FOR SHUNTING INDUCED CURRENTS IN AN ELECTRICAL LEAD | [2009/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR SHUNTER DES COURANTS INDUITS DANS UN CONDUCTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2009/15] |
Former [2004/44] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON WIRBELSTRÖMEN IN EINER ELEKTRISCHEN LEITUNG MITTELS EINES SHUNTS | ||
Former [2004/44] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SHUNTING INDUCED CURRENTS IN AN ELECTRICAL LEAD | ||
Former [2004/44] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SHUNTER DES COURANTS INDUITS DANS UN CONDUCTEUR ELECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 19.08.2009 | SE | 19.08.2009 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/10] | NL | 19.08.2009 | |
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | SE | 19.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4320763 (MONEY DAVID) [A] 1,15,22,27 * column 2, line 10 - line 43; figure - *; | [A]US5325870 (KROLL MARK W [US], et al) [A] 1,15,22,27 * column 4, line 46 - column 6, line 61; figure - *; | [A]US5366496 (DAHL ROGER W [US], et al) [A] 1,15,22,27 * column 5, line 35 - column 8, line 2; figure - *; | [A]EP0778048 (ELA MEDICAL SA [FR]) [A] 1* page 3, column 3, line 40 - page 4, column 6, line 52; figure - *; | [A]US5824029 (WEIJAND KOEN J [NL], et al) [A] 1,15,22,27 * column 5, line 33 - column 8, line 19; figure - * |