EP1490299 - METHOD FOR THE SURFACE PURIFICATION OF A GRAPHITE CONTAINING IMPURITIES USING A DILUTE AQUEOUS SOLUTION OF NH4F AND H2SO4 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDRO-QUEBEC 75, Boulevard René-Lévesque Ouest Montréal, Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states HYDRO QUEBEC 75 Boulevard René Lévesque Ouest Montréal H2Z 1A4 Québec / CA | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states HYDRO QUEBEC 75 Boulevard René Lévesque Ouest Montréal H2Z 1A4, Québec / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAGHIB, Karim 3672, Belcourt Longueuil, Québec J4M 2M7 / CA | 02 /
GUERFI, Abdelbast 8655, boulevard Rivard Brossard, Québec J4X 1W2 / CA | 03 /
ARMAND, Michel 2965, Fendall Montréal, Québec H3T 1N2 / CA | 04 /
GAGNON, Claude 1301 du Candélabre Val-Bélair, Québec G3K 2H9 / CA | 05 /
KINOSHITA, Kimio 20644 Nancy Court Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Sueur, Yvette, et al Ipsilon Brema-Loyer Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Sueur, Yvette, et al Cabinet SUEUR et L'HELGOUALCH, 109, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03704116.7 | 12.02.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003CA00209 | Priority number, date | CA20022374132 | 01.03.2002 Original published format: CA 2374132 | [2005/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03074419 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1490299 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1490299 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/04, H01M4/58 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
C01B32/215 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OBERFLÄCHENREINIGUNG VON VERUNREINIGUNGEN ENTHALTENDEM GRAPHIT MITTELS EINER NH4F UND H2SO4 ENTHALTENDEN WÄSSRIGEN LÖSUNG | [2005/01] | English: | METHOD FOR THE SURFACE PURIFICATION OF A GRAPHITE CONTAINING IMPURITIES USING A DILUTE AQUEOUS SOLUTION OF NH4F AND H2SO4 | [2005/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION EN SURFACE D'UN GRAPHITE CONTENANT DES IMPURETES A L'AIDE D'UNE SOLUTION AQUEUSE DILUEE DE NH4F ET DE H2SO4 | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 06.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.11.2008 | CZ | 26.11.2008 | DK | 26.11.2008 | EE | 26.11.2008 | FI | 26.11.2008 | NL | 26.11.2008 | SI | 26.11.2008 | SK | 26.11.2008 | TR | 26.11.2008 | BG | 26.02.2009 | GR | 27.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | HU | 27.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 26.11.2008 | |
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
HU | 27.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 26.11.2008 | |
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 26.11.2008 | |
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 26.11.2008 | |
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 26.11.2008 | |
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | DK | 26.11.2008 | |
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 26.11.2008 | |
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE125304 (HERMANN LANGBEIN) [A] 1-45* claim 1 *; | [X]CA2299626 (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA]) [X] 1-45 * example 6; claims 1-4 *; | [DX]WO0162666 (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA], et al) [DX] 1-45 * page 6, lines 23-25; example 5; claims 1,4-14,16-26 * * page 8, lines 7,8 *; | [X]CA2307118 (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA]) [X] 1-45 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 2; examples 2,6; claims 1-16 * * page 9, lines 8-18 *; | [PX]WO0234670 (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA], et al) [PX] 37,38 * claims 1,6 * |