EP1601297 - LOCKING SCREW FOR AN INTRAMEDULLARY NAIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthes GmbH Eimattstrasse 3 4436 Oberdorf / CH | [2006/43] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states Synthes AG Chur Grabenstrasse 15 7002 Chur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENN Peter Burgmattstrasse 18 CH-4437 Waldenburg / CH | 02 /
SCHLIENGER, André Tunnelweg 16 CH-4142 Münchenstein / CH | 03 /
BUETTLER, Markus Hirsackerstrasse 14 CH-4702 Oensingen / CH | [2006/21] |
Former [2005/49] | 01 /
SENN Peter Burgmattstrasse 18 CH-4437 Waldenburg / CH | ||
02 /
SCHLIENGER, André Tunnelweg 16 CH-4142 Münchenstein / CH | |||
03 /
BUETTLER, Markus Im Rank 199 CH-4717 Mümliswil / CH | Representative(s) | Lusuardi, Werther Dr. Lusuardi AG Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Lusuardi, Werther Dr. Lusuardi AG Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2005/49] | Lusuardi, Werther Giovanni Dr. Lusuardi AG, Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 03704149.8 | 07.03.2003 | [2005/49] | WO2003CH00157 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004078049 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1601297 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1601297 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/72 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
A61B17/725 (EP,US);
A61B17/72 (KR);
A61B17/70 (KR);
A61B2017/8655 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] |
Former [2005/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSSCHRAUBE FÜR MARKNAGEL | [2005/49] | English: | LOCKING SCREW FOR AN INTRAMEDULLARY NAIL | [2005/49] | French: | VIS DE BLOCAGE POUR CLOU INTRAMEDULLAIRE | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10010953.7 / EP2263584 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2003 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | NL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | ES | 28.10.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | AT | 07.03.2014 | IE | 07.03.2014 | LU | 07.03.2014 | BE | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.03.2003 | |
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
AT | 07.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | BG | 17.07.2013 | |
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
AT | 07.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 17.07.2013 | |
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
AT | 07.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
AT | 07.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | SE | 17.07.2013 | |
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 18.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4657001 (FIXEL IRVING E [US]) [A] 1,2,7-9,11,13,14 * column 5, line 48 - line 54; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO03015649 (TANTUM AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,8,9,13,14 * abstract *; | [A]US4754749 (TSOU PAUL M [US]) [A] 1,2,7,10,13,14 * abstract *; | [A]EP1214914 (BERNSTEINER HERBERT [AT], et al) [A] 1,8 * figures 1,3 * | Examination | EP1281365 | by applicant | EP1214914 | EP1281365 |