|
06.10.2008 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.06.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
16.05.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.10.2003 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Sequence listing |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Sequence listing |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
41 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |