EP1485584 - CYLINDER PISTON DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/12] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISCHKER, Karsten Erwin-Schoettle-Strasse 22 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
HAMMER, Uwe Muenchingerstrasse 10 71282 Hemmingen / DE | 03 /
REIMER, Stefan Lembergerweg 2 71706 Markgroeningen / DE | 04 /
ENGELBERG, Ralph Untere Gasse 2 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [2004/51] | Application number, filing date | 03704222.3 | 17.01.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003DE00120 | Priority number, date | DE2002110158 | 07.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10210158 | [2004/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03074844 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1485584 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1485584 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01L9/02, F01L1/46 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
F01L1/46 (EP,KR,US);
F01L9/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2007/42] |
Former [2004/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ZYLINDER - KOLBENTRIEB | [2007/41] | English: | CYLINDER PISTON DRIVE | [2004/51] | French: | COMMANDE DE PISTON DE CYLINDRE | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/51] | ZYLINDER-KOLBENTRIEB | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 21.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.03.2008 | [2009/39] | Cited in | International search | [A]US3209737 (ISAO OMOTEHARA, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 35-44 * * column 10, line 61 - column 12, line 3 * * figures 1,6A-7C *; | [A]EP0443218 (MAGNAVOX CO [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, lines 39-57 * * column 7, line 19 - column 8, line 23 * * column 8, line 32 - column 9, line 35 ** figures 1,3-5,8,9 *; | [A]DE10040115 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19826047 | DE10143959 |