EP1487203 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUNOKAWA, Motoki, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
FUJIWARA, Nobuyuki, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
NARAHARA, Tatsuya, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Leppard, Andrew John D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Leppard, Andrew John D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03705067.1 | 12.02.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003JP01419 | Priority number, date | JP20020077731 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002077731 | [2004/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03079680 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1487203 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/76, H04N5/44 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
H04H60/82 (EP,KR,US);
H04H20/00 (KR);
H04H60/72 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/26291 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (KR);
H04N7/173 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2004/51] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD | [2004/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2004 | Translation filed | 17.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 20.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10177777 (NTT DATA TSUSHIN KK); | [X]JPH10269754 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2000101965 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2000270288 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2000278623 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JP2001203965 (INTERACTIVE PROGRAM GUIDE KK); | [X]JP2001257975 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [A]JP2001326865 (FUJITSU LTD) |