EP1476487 - CURABLE LIQUID RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | For all designated states JSR Corporation 1-9-2 Higashi-Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | [2010/02] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
For all designated states JSR Corporation 2-11-24, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | |||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
For all designated states JSR Corporation 2-11-24, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIMOTO, Masanobu 2-11-24, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Toky o104-8410 / JP | 02 /
SUGIMOTO, Hideki 2-11-24, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | 03 /
KOMIYA, Zen 2-11-24, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | 04 /
UKACHI, Takashi 2-11-24, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | van Loon, C.J.J. Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J. Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2007/22] | van Loon, C.J.J. c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2004/47] | Hoogendam, Gerrie Christine DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 03705513.4 | 17.02.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003NL00118 | Priority number, date | JP20020040877 | 19.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002040877 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03070802 | Date: | 28.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1476487 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1476487 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1476487 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/67, C08G18/48, C09D175/16, C03C25/10 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
C09D175/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/48 (KR);
C03C25/106 (EP,US);
C08G18/4808 (EP,US);
C08G18/67 (KR);
C08G18/672 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/672, C08G18/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE FLÜSSIGE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2004/47] | English: | CURABLE LIQUID RESIN COMPOSITION | [2004/47] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE LIQUIDE DURCISSABLE | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 21.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.12.2009 | BE | 02.12.2009 | CY | 02.12.2009 | CZ | 02.12.2009 | DK | 02.12.2009 | EE | 02.12.2009 | FI | 02.12.2009 | SE | 02.12.2009 | SI | 02.12.2009 | SK | 02.12.2009 | TR | 02.12.2009 | IE | 17.02.2010 | LU | 17.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | BG | 02.03.2010 | GB | 02.03.2010 | GR | 03.03.2010 | ES | 13.03.2010 | PT | 02.04.2010 | HU | 03.06.2010 | DE | 01.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
LU | 17.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GB | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
HU | 03.06.2010 | ||
DE | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GB | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
HU | 03.06.2010 | ||
DE | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GB | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
DE | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
DE | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 02.12.2009 | |
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 02.12.2009 | |
SE | 02.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9321248 (DSM DESOTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 17 - page 5, line 15; example 2; claims 1-4 *; | [X]WO0075211 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 26 - page 8, line 24 * * page 21, line 15 - line 31; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP1070682 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [A] 1* page 2, line 40 - page 4, line 10; claims 1,7 * |