EP1486009 - SUPPRESSION FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Powerline Communications AB Box 1561, Alvgatan 3 651 21 Karlstad / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Powerline Communications AB Box 1561, Alvgatan 3 651 21 Karlstad / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Ake Persiljevägen 13 S-653 51 Karlstad / SE | [2005/28] |
Former [2004/51] | 01 /
HANSEN, ke Persiljevägen 13 S-653 51 Karlstad / SE | Representative(s) | Westman, Per Börje Ingemar, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Westman, Per Börje Ingemar, et al Ström & Gullikson Intellectual Property AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Gothenburg / SE | Application number, filing date | 03705608.2 | 22.02.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003SE00271 | Priority number, date | SE20020000553 | 22.02.2002 Original published format: SE 0200553 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03071709 | Date: | 28.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1486009 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1486009 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/56 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
H04B3/56 (EP);
H04B2203/5491 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERDRÜCKÜNGSFILTER | [2004/51] | English: | SUPPRESSION FILTER | [2004/51] | French: | FILTRE DE SUPPRESSION | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 27.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.07.2005 | BE | 13.07.2005 | CY | 13.07.2005 | CZ | 13.07.2005 | EE | 13.07.2005 | FI | 13.07.2005 | IT | 13.07.2005 | NL | 13.07.2005 | SI | 13.07.2005 | SK | 13.07.2005 | TR | 13.07.2005 | BG | 13.10.2005 | DK | 13.10.2005 | GR | 13.10.2005 | SE | 13.10.2005 | DE | 14.10.2005 | HU | 14.01.2006 | IE | 22.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/40] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
BE | 13.07.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2005 | ||
EE | 13.07.2005 | ||
FI | 13.07.2005 | ||
IT | 13.07.2005 | ||
NL | 13.07.2005 | ||
SI | 13.07.2005 | ||
SK | 13.07.2005 | ||
TR | 13.07.2005 | ||
BG | 13.10.2005 | ||
DK | 13.10.2005 | ||
GR | 13.10.2005 | ||
SE | 13.10.2005 | ||
DE | 14.10.2005 | ||
HU | 14.01.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
BE | 13.07.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2005 | ||
EE | 13.07.2005 | ||
FI | 13.07.2005 | ||
NL | 13.07.2005 | ||
SI | 13.07.2005 | ||
SK | 13.07.2005 | ||
TR | 13.07.2005 | ||
BG | 13.10.2005 | ||
DK | 13.10.2005 | ||
GR | 13.10.2005 | ||
SE | 13.10.2005 | ||
DE | 14.10.2005 | ||
HU | 14.01.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
BE | 13.07.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2005 | ||
FI | 13.07.2005 | ||
NL | 13.07.2005 | ||
SI | 13.07.2005 | ||
SK | 13.07.2005 | ||
TR | 13.07.2005 | ||
BG | 13.10.2005 | ||
DK | 13.10.2005 | ||
GR | 13.10.2005 | ||
SE | 13.10.2005 | ||
DE | 14.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
BE | 13.07.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2005 | ||
FI | 13.07.2005 | ||
NL | 13.07.2005 | ||
SI | 13.07.2005 | ||
SK | 13.07.2005 | ||
BG | 13.10.2005 | ||
DK | 13.10.2005 | ||
GR | 13.10.2005 | ||
SE | 13.10.2005 | ||
DE | 14.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/29] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
BE | 13.07.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2005 | ||
FI | 13.07.2005 | ||
NL | 13.07.2005 | ||
SI | 13.07.2005 | ||
SK | 13.07.2005 | ||
BG | 13.10.2005 | ||
DK | 13.10.2005 | ||
GR | 13.10.2005 | ||
SE | 13.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
BE | 13.07.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2005 | ||
FI | 13.07.2005 | ||
NL | 13.07.2005 | ||
SI | 13.07.2005 | ||
BG | 13.10.2005 | ||
DK | 13.10.2005 | ||
GR | 13.10.2005 | ||
SE | 13.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
BE | 13.07.2005 | ||
FI | 13.07.2005 | ||
NL | 13.07.2005 | ||
SI | 13.07.2005 | ||
BG | 13.10.2005 | ||
GR | 13.10.2005 | ||
SE | 13.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
FI | 13.07.2005 | ||
NL | 13.07.2005 | ||
SI | 13.07.2005 | ||
BG | 13.10.2005 | ||
GR | 13.10.2005 | ||
SE | 13.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
FI | 13.07.2005 | ||
SI | 13.07.2005 | ||
BG | 13.10.2005 | ||
SE | 13.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP3373659B ; | [A]EP1003295 (REGIOCOM GMBH [DE]); | [A]US6282405 (BROWN PAUL ANTHONY [GB]); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 17, Database accession no. 1996-103038, XP002959034 & JP3373659B B2 19960204 (SANEISHA SEISAKUSHO KK) |