EP1565138 - CONTROLLED PLACEMENT OF A REINFORCING WEB WITHIN A FIBROUS ABSORBENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENTURINO, Michael, B. 2124 Omega Drive Appleton, WI 54915 / US | 02 /
JONES, Steven, P. 1429 Julie Court Neenah, WI 54956 / US | 03 /
MELIUS, Shannon, K. 3118 Blueridge Drive Appleton, WI 54914 / US | 04 /
OLMSTEAD, Paul, E. 1721 Acorn Court Menasha, WI 54952 / US | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03705663.7 | 03.01.2003 | [2005/34] | WO2003US00293 | Priority number, date | US20020306186 | 27.11.2002 Original published format: US 306186 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004049991 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1565138 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1565138 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
A61F13/15626 (EP,US);
A61F13/511 (KR);
A61F13/15 (KR);
A61F13/51 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEREGELTE POSITIONIERUNG EINES VERSTÄRKUNGSGEWEBES INNERHALB EINES SAUGFÄHIGES FASERGEGENSTANDES | [2009/23] | English: | CONTROLLED PLACEMENT OF A REINFORCING WEB WITHIN A FIBROUS ABSORBENT | [2005/34] | French: | MISE EN PLACE CONTROLEE D'UNE BANDE DE RENFORCEMENT DANS UN ABSORBANT FIBREUX | [2005/34] |
Former [2005/34] | GEREGELTE POSITIONIERUNG EINES VERSTÄRKUNGSGEWEBES INNERHALB EINES SAUGFÄHIGEN FASERGEGENSTANDES | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 28.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.2009 | BE | 09.12.2009 | CY | 09.12.2009 | CZ | 09.12.2009 | DK | 09.12.2009 | EE | 09.12.2009 | FI | 09.12.2009 | NL | 09.12.2009 | SE | 09.12.2009 | SI | 09.12.2009 | SK | 09.12.2009 | TR | 09.12.2009 | IE | 03.01.2010 | LU | 03.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | FR | 09.02.2010 | BG | 09.03.2010 | GR | 10.03.2010 | ES | 20.03.2010 | PT | 09.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 03.01.2010 | ||
LU | 03.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 09.02.2010 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 03.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 09.02.2010 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 09.02.2010 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
SE | 09.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3156751 (VALDES THOMAS H, et al) [A] 1-31* column 4, lines 58-65; figure 7 *; | [A]EP0226939 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-31 * figure - *; | [AD]EP0467409 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [AD] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9822064 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO0056257 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [DA] 1-31 * the whole document * |