EP1468489 - OPERATIONAL AMPLIFIER HAVING IMPROVED INPUT OFFSET PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway LC340 Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | ||
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway LC340 Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERNON, Scott, D. 4622 West Erie Street Chandler, AZ 85226 / US | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03705754.4 | 14.01.2003 | [2004/43] | WO2003US01040 | Priority number, date | US20020052035 | 16.01.2002 Original published format: US 52035 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03063344 | Date: | 31.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1468489 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1468489 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45, H03F3/30 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
H03F3/45596 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL, SE [2006/11] |
Former [2004/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPERATIONSVERSTÄRKER MIT VERBESSERTEM EINGANGSGLEICHSPANNUNGSVERSCHIEBUNGSBEREICH | [2004/43] | English: | OPERATIONAL AMPLIFIER HAVING IMPROVED INPUT OFFSET PERFORMANCE | [2004/43] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR OPERATIONNEL POSSEDANT DES PERFORMANCES DE DECALAGE D'ENTREE AMELIOREES | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 20.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4590435 (TANAKA TATSUO [JP]) [Y] 1-5,10-14,17-20,26-32 * column 5, line 50 - column 7, line 3; figures 8,9 * [A] 7; | [YA]EP0072082 (PRECISION MONOLITHICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-5,10-14,17-20,26-32 * page 9, line 8 - page 13, line 2; figure 5 * [A] 8,15,21; | [A]US5491437 (RINCON GABRIEL A [US], et al) [A] 6,23,24 * column 3, line 16 - column 7, line 14; figures 1,3 * |