EP1470121 - PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS RHO-KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare LLC 555 White Plains Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2010/31] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corporation 400 Morgan Lane West Haven, CT 06516 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGARATHNAM, Dhanapalan 52 Virginia Drive Bethany, CT 06524 / US | 02 /
DUMAS, Jacques 98 Farmview Road Bethany, CT 06524 / US | 03 /
HATOUM-MOKDAD, Holia 43 Joseph Lane Hamden, CT 06514 / US | 04 /
BOYER, Stephen 233 Colony Street Fairfield, CT 06430 / US | 05 /
WANG, Chunguang 27 Timberwood Trail Hamden, CT 06514 / US | 06 /
PLUEMPE, Hans Kirshbaumstrasse 9 D-42115 Wuppertal / DE | 07 /
FEURER, Achim Erlbrunnenweg 5 69259 Wilhelmsfeld / DE | 08 /
BENNABI, Samir Alsenstrabe 23 A 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/44] | Cabinet Hirsch 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03705858.3 | 23.01.2003 | [2004/44] | WO2003US01839 | Priority number, date | US20020349987P | 23.01.2002 Original published format: US 349987 P | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03062225 | Date: | 31.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1470121 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1470121 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D239/48, C07D413/12, C07D403/12, C07D413/14, C07D409/14, C07D471/04, A61K31/506 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
C07D239/48 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | PYRIMIDIN-DERIVATE ALS RHO KINASE INHIBITOREN | [2004/44] | English: | PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS RHO-KINASE INHIBITORS | [2004/44] | French: | DERIVES PYRIMIDINE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE KINASE RHO | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2003 | AT | 11.07.2012 | BE | 11.07.2012 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | DK | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | FI | 11.07.2012 | IT | 11.07.2012 | NL | 11.07.2012 | SE | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | TR | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | ES | 22.10.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | GB | 23.01.2013 | IE | 23.01.2013 | LU | 23.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | FR | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
TR | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
GB | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
GB | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
GB | 23.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0153331 (ADHEREX TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1 * figure 23E; example 425 *; | WO02060392 [ ] (SYNAPTIC PHARMA CORP [US]); | [A]WO9719065 (CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * claim - * * example - *; | [A]WO0119802 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * claim - * * example - *; | [A]DE19851421 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * claim - * * example - * | [PX] - BLACKBURN, THOMAS P. ET AL, "Preparation of pyrimidine and indol-2-one derivatives as galanin GAL3 receptor antagonists for the treatment of depression and/or anxiety", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 137:154941, URL: STN, XP002239813 [PX] 1 * abstract * |