EP1479020 - MARKET RESPONSE MODELING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manugistics Atlanta, Inc. 9715 Key West Avenue Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2004/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAS, Stephen, M. 260 Arlington Way Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
ISAAKS, Edward 1042 Wilmington Way Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | 03 /
BOYD, Dean, W. 36245 Wagner Lane Cottage Grove, OR 97424 / US | 04 /
VAUGHN, Mary, A., McShane 115 Misty Forest Drive Fayetteville, GA 30215 / US | 05 /
PHILLIPS, Robert c/o Manugistics, Inc. 9715 Key West Avenue Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US | 06 /
ELDREDGE, Michael, J., Jr. 231 Vine Street Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 07 /
KADNER, Debra 323 Beemer Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 08 /
DENIZERI, Yosun 1311 Ulloa Street San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | 09 /
GUARDINO, Thomas 1033 Forrester Way Eugene, OR 97401 / US | [2005/06] |
Former [2004/48] | 01 /
HAAS, Stephen, M. 260 Arlington Way Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | ||
02 /
ISAAKS, Edward 1042 Wilmington Way Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | |||
03 /
BOYD, Dean, W. 36245 Wagner Lane Cottage Grove, OR 97424 / US | |||
04 /
VAUGHN, Mary, A., McShane 115 Misty Forest Drive Fayetteville, GA 30215 / US | |||
05 /
PHILLIPS, Robert 10 W 74th, 2A New York, NY 10023 / US | |||
06 /
ELDREDGE, Michael, J., Jr. 231 Vine Street Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
07 /
KADNER, Debra 323 Beemer Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | |||
08 /
DENIZERI, Yosun 1311 Ulloa Street San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | |||
09 /
GUARDINO, Thomas 1033 Forrester Way Eugene, OR 97401 / US | Representative(s) | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03706021.7 | 03.02.2003 | [2004/48] | WO2003US03004 | Priority number, date | US20020352878P | 01.02.2002 Original published format: US 352878 P | US20020358732P | 25.02.2002 Original published format: US 358732 P | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03065170 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1479020 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
G06Q40/08 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0637 (EP,US);
G06Q30/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULIEREN DES MARKTANSPRECHVERHALTENS | [2004/48] | English: | MARKET RESPONSE MODELING | [2004/48] | French: | MODELISATION DE LA REACTION DU MARCHE | [2004/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/09] | 10.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6078906 (HUBERMAN BERNARDO A [US]); | [XP]US6456982 (PILIPOVIC DRAGANA N [US]) |