EP1481346 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS TO VISUALLY PRESENT DISCUSSIONS FOR DATA MINING PURPOSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cataphora, Inc. 2121 Broadway Street Suite 156 Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2004/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARNOCK, Elizabeth, B. 818 Balboa Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 02 /
THOMPSON, Curtis 2735 W. Tippecanoe Tucson, Arizona 85745 / US | 03 /
ROBERTS, Steven, L. 818 Balboa Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/49] | 01 /
CHARNOCK, Elizabeth, B. 818 Balboa Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | ||
02 /
THOMPSON, Curtis 1742 B. Cedar Street Berkeley, CA 94703 / US | |||
03 /
ROBERTS, Steven, L. 818 Balboa Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | Representative(s) | Frost, Alex John, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Frost, Alex John, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | Frost, Alex John, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03706095.1 | 04.02.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003US03504 | Priority number, date | US20020354403P | 04.02.2002 Original published format: US 354403 P | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03067497 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1481346 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1481346 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06Q10/10 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06F16/34 (EP,US);
G06F16/38 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99935 (US)
|
Former IPC [2004/49] | G06F17/60, G06F11/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VISUELLEN PRÄSENTATION VON DISKUSSIONEN ZUM ZWECKE DES SAMMELNS VON DATEN | [2004/49] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS TO VISUALLY PRESENT DISCUSSIONS FOR DATA MINING PURPOSES | [2004/49] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRESENTATION VISUELLE DE DEBATS A DES FINS D'EXPLORATION EN PROFONDEUR DE DONNEES | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 02.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2003 | AT | 10.10.2012 | BE | 10.10.2012 | CY | 10.10.2012 | CZ | 10.10.2012 | DK | 10.10.2012 | EE | 10.10.2012 | FI | 10.10.2012 | IT | 10.10.2012 | NL | 10.10.2012 | SE | 10.10.2012 | SI | 10.10.2012 | SK | 10.10.2012 | TR | 10.10.2012 | BG | 10.01.2013 | GR | 11.01.2013 | ES | 21.01.2013 | IE | 04.02.2013 | LU | 04.02.2013 | PT | 11.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
TR | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 10.10.2012 | |
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 10.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0157633 (RUDOLPH JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-66* the whole document *; | [X]US2001018698 (UCHINO KANJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-66 * abstract *; | [X] - SMITH M A ET AL ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, "VISUALIZATION COMPONENTS FOR PERSISTENT CONVERSATIONS", CHI 2001 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS. SEATTLE, WA, MARCH 31 - APRIL 5, 2001, CHI CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20010331), ISBN 1-58113-327-8, pages 136 - 143, XP001090370 [X] 1-66 * abstract * * page 141 - page 143 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/365024.365073 | [X] - WARREN SACK, "Conversation map: a content-based Usenet newsgroup browser", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT USER INTERFACES, New Orleans, USA, ISBN 1-58113-134-8, (2000), pages 233 - 240, URL: http://portal.acm.org/citation.cfm?id=325737.325856, (20080214), XP002468983 [X] 1-66 * abstract * * page 234 - page 237 * | [X] - DONATH J ET AL, "VISUALIZING CONVERSATION", SYSTEMS SCIENCES, 1999. HICSS-32. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 32ND ANNUAL HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MAUI, HI, USA 5-8 JAN. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19990105), ISBN 0-7695-0001-3, pages 1 - 9, XP002301306 [X] 1-66 * the whole document * | [X] - KATASHI NAGAO ED - AKITO SAKURAI ET AL, "Discussion Mining: Knowledge Discovery from Semantically Annotated Discussion Content", NEW FRONTIERS IN ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BE, (1900), vol. 3609, ISBN 978-3-540-71008-0, pages 158 - 168, XP019055847 [X] 1-66 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5689550 (GARSON MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US6209100 (ROBERTSON SHELDON I [US], et al); | [A]US6275811 (GINN MICHAEL R [US]); | [AP]US6381579 (GERVAIS PAUL M [US], et al) | Examination | US2001014910 | by applicant | WO03067473 | - SMITH M A ET AL., "Visualization Components for Persistent Conversations", CHI 2001 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, (20010331), doi:doi:10.1145/365024.365073, pages 136 - 143, XP002301011 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/365024.365073 |