EP1476829 - ENGINEERING METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR INDUSTRIAL AUTOMATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THURNER, Elmar Gneisenaustrasse 12 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [2004/47] | Application number, filing date | 03706301.3 | 07.02.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003DE00358 | Priority number, date | DE2002106902 | 19.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10206902 | [2004/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03071455 | Date: | 28.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1476829 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G05B19/0426 (EP,US);
G05B2219/23292 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Title | German: | ENGINEERINGVERFAHREN UND ENGINEERINGSYSTEM F R INDUSTRIELLE AUTOMATISIERUNGSSYSTEME | [2004/47] | English: | ENGINEERING METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR INDUSTRIAL AUTOMATION SYSTEMS | [2004/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'INGENIERIE DESTINES A DES SYSTEMES D'AUTOMATISATION INDUSTRIELS | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/39] | 07.05.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.05.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19955718 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-30 * page 3, lines 4-8 * * page 4, lines 65-68 * * page 6, lines 40-42 *; | [X]DE19910535 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 31 * * column 3, lines 60-66 * * column 4, lines 27-54 *; | [A]WO0063751 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * figure 4 *; | [A]DE19959245 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * column 1, lines 12-19 * * column 1, lines 60-63 * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]DE10112843 (LANGNER COMM AG [DE]) [A] 1-30 * abstract ** page 7, paragraph 9 *; | US6415297 [ ] (LEYMANN FRANK [DE], et al) [ ] * column 2, lines 55-65 * * column 5, lines 32-60 * * column 8, lines 18-25 *; | [A] - CHAPELL DAVID, ActiveX und OLE verstehen (Ausschnitt: S.62-65, 232-234), UNTERSCHLEISSHEIM, MICROSOFT PRESS, (1996), XP002270816 [A] 1-30 * pages 62-65 * * pages 232-234 * | [A] - LAVANA H ET AL, "Executable Workflows: A Paradigm For Collaborative Design On The Internet", PROCEEDINGS OF THE DESIGN AUTOMATION CONFERENCE. ANAHEIM, JUNE 9 - 13, 1997, NEW YORK, ACM, US, (19970609), vol. CONF. 34, ISBN 0-7803-4093-0, pages 553 - 558, XP010227500 [A] 1-30 * abstract * * page 554; figures 2,4,6,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/266021.266283 |