EP1485339 - BENZYL ALCOHOL DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2004/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖLZL, Werner 4, rue de l'Argent F-68440 Eschentzwiller / FR | 02 /
KOPPOLD, Jürgen Röttler Strasse 44 79541 Lörrach / DE | 03 /
MARQUAIS-BIENEWALD, Sophie 63, rue de Hagenthal F-68220 Hegenheim / FR | 04 /
PREUSS, Andrea Hochstrasse 35 CH-4053 Basel / CH | [2004/51] | Application number, filing date | 03706613.1 | 13.03.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003EP02618 | Priority number, date | EP20020405210 | 19.03.2002 Original published format: EP 02405210 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03078367 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1485339 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/23, A01N31/14, A61K7/16, A01N55/10, C07C43/253, C07F7/08 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
A61Q17/005 (EP,US);
A01N31/14 (EP,US);
A01N31/16 (EP,US);
A01N55/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61P31/02 (EP);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61Q5/00 (EP,US);
C07C43/23 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENZYLALKOHOLDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ANTIMIKROBIELLE WIRKSTOFFE | [2004/51] | English: | BENZYL ALCOHOL DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS | [2004/51] | French: | DERIVES D'ALCOOL BENZYLIQUE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS ANTIMICROBIENS | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 01.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/19] | 03.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5391817 (SPRINGER DANE [US], et al) [X] 6,17 * column 43, line 12 - column 45, line 22 *; | [X]US4668705 (MOELLER HINRICH [DE], et al) [X] 15,17 * column 3, line 41 *; | [X]WO0162082 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [X] 17 * page 42; example 5B *; | [X]JP2000191520 ; | [X]EP1053989 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,7-13,15,16 * claims 1-12, in particular page 40, lines 16-22 *; | [A]EP0908553 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1,9 * claims 1,8 *; | [A]WO9801524 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,11 * claim - *; | [A]US4946865 (TAKAHASHI JUNYA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US4663314 (HAYASE YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim - * | [X] - H. . SHAM ET AL, "A novel, picomolar inhibitor of human immunodeficiency virus type 1 protease", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (1996), vol. 39, no. 2, pages 392 - 397, XP002218373 [X] 17 * page 396, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9507183 | [X] - K. TANAKA ET AL, "Asymmetric reduction with 5-deazaflavin. II. Synthesis of some chiral 5-deazaflavin derivatives", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN., TOKYO JP, (1990), vol. 38, no. 2, pages 312 - 317, XP002218374 [X] 17 * page 315, column 2, paragraph 4 * | [X] - E PROFFT, "o-Vanilin and novovanillin (2-hydroxy-3-ethoxybenzaldehyde). II. 2,3-Dialkoxyphenyl-beta-ethylamines", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19591010), vol. 53, no. 19, column 17941e, XP002218376 [X] 17 * abstract * | [ ] - ARCH. PHARM., (1959), vol. 292, pages 70 - 75 | [X] - A. NAKAZATO ET AL, "Design, synthesis, structure-activity relationships, and biological characterization of novel arylalkoxyphenylalkylamine sigma ligands as potential antipsychotic drugs", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (1999), vol. 42, no. 6, pages 1076 - 1087, XP002218375 [X] 6,17 * page 1083, column 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm980212v | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 00, no. 50, Database accession no. 2000-545825, XP002261555 & JP2000191520 A 00000000 (SAKUMA) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-13,15,16 * abstract * | [A] - D. REHN UND H. NOLTE, "Zur antimikrobiellen Wirksamkeit subtituierter aromatischer Aldehyde und Alkohole", ZBL. BAKT. HYG., I. ABT. ORIG. B, (1979), vol. 168, pages 507 - 516, XP000617375 [A] 1 * Tabelle 1, Verbindung Nr. 34 * |