EP1488816 - CLOSED CELL CULTURE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Next 21 K.K. 38-1, Hongo 3-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2017/33] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states New X-national Technology K.K. 18-4, Shibuya 3-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Shigeki 4-22-13, Ikejiri Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 154-0001 / JP | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/40] |
Former [2004/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03707196.6 | 04.03.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003JP02501 | Priority number, date | JP20020057129 | 04.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002057129 | [2004/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03074100 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1488816 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1488816 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/38, C12N5/00, A61L27/54, A61L27/58, A61L27/60, A61L31/14, A61F13/00, A61M25/10, A61M37/00 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
A61L27/3804 (EP,US);
A61M37/00 (US);
A61F13/00063 (EP,US);
A61F13/05 (EP,US);
A61L27/3895 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
A61L27/60 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61M25/10 (US);
A61F2013/00174 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00221 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00536 (EP,US);
A61F2013/0054 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00927 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/52] | A61L27/38, C12N5/00, // C12M3:00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/40] |
Former [2004/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GESCHLOSSENES ZELLKULTURSYSTEM | [2004/52] | English: | CLOSED CELL CULTURE SYSTEM | [2004/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CULTURE CELLULAIRE FERMÉ | [2017/21] |
Former [2004/52] | SYSTEME DE CULTURE CELLULAIRE FERME | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2004 | Translation filed | 04.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 23.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.2013 | 31.03.2015 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2003 | AT | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | CZ | 04.10.2017 | DK | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | ES | 04.10.2017 | FI | 04.10.2017 | IT | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | NL | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | SE | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | TR | 04.10.2017 | BG | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | IE | 04.03.2018 | LU | 04.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | FR | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 04.03.2003 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 04.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9308850 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8,14 * page 4, lines 21-25 * * page 5, lines 10-20 * * page 7, lines 7-15 * * page 8, lines 3-4, 27-29 * * page 9, lines 8-10 * * page 22, lines 27-30 *; | [XI]WO9531157 (THM BIOMEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,13 * page 3, lines 5-11 * * page 7, lines 19-28 * * page 9, lines 2-4 * * page 12, lines 16-29 * * page 14, lines 16-18 * * page 15, lines 30-36 * * page 22, lines 16-18 * * page 28, lines 18-31 * * page 30, lines 4-19 * * page 45; claim 79 * [I] 2,6,9-12; | [X]WO9907276 (THERAPEUTIC MICRODIALYSIS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,13,14 * page 25, lines 11-16 * * page 28, line 9 - page 29, line 5 * * figure 16 *; | [A]US6218182 (NAUGHTON BRIAN A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 2, lines 19-31 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 9 *; | [A]US2001021529 (TAKAGI TAKAO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * page 3, paragraph 0024 * * page 8, paragraph 0104 ** page 16, paragraph 0179 - paragraph 0180 * | International search | [X]WO9531157 (THM BIOMEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [X]WO9907276 (THERAPEUTIC MICRODIALYSIS CORP [US], et al); | [Y]JPH1146759 (TERUMO CORP); | [Y]US2001021529 (TAKAGI TAKAO [JP]); | [A]WO0187271 (DAVID JAMES JOHNSON [US]) | Examination | US2001021529 | WO0187271 |