EP1470032 - PRESSURE SENSOR INTEGRATED INTO AN ELECTRO-HYDRAULIC CONTROL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY 12000 Tech Center Drive Livonia, MI 48150 / US | [2004/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BABALA, Michael 45178 Pine Tree Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | 02 /
BOLITHO, Marc 7405 Jeffrey Ct. Linden, MI 48451 / US | 03 /
BARON, Thomas Bellerwiese 52 53518 Leimbach / DE | 04 /
GEGALSKI, Helmut Kolpingstrasse 8 56218 Mühlheim-Kärlich / DE | [2010/44] |
Former [2004/44] | 01 /
BABALA, Michael 45178 Pine Tree Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | ||
02 /
BOLITHO, Marc 7405 Jeffrey Ct. Linden, MI 48451 / US | |||
03 /
BARON, Thomas Bellerwiese 52 53518, Leimbach / DE | |||
04 /
GEGALSKI, Helmut Kolpingstrasse 8 56218 Mühlheim-Kärlich / DE | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Beyer, Andreas, Dr. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03707661.9 | 31.01.2003 | [2004/44] | WO2003US03044 | Priority number, date | US20020062169 | 31.01.2002 Original published format: US 62169 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03064230 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1470032 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1470032 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/36, G01L19/00, F15B13/00 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
G01L19/003 (EP,US);
B60T8/3675 (EP,US);
F15B11/028 (EP,US);
F15B13/0803 (EP,US);
G01L19/0007 (EP,US);
G01L19/0084 (EP,US);
G01L19/0645 (EP,US);
G01L19/14 (EP,US);
G01L19/142 (EP,US);
G01L19/147 (EP,US);
G01L19/148 (EP,US);
G01L9/0051 (EP,US);
G01L9/0072 (EP,US);
H01R13/6315 (EP,US);
F15B2013/004 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKSENSOR INTEGRIERT IN EINE ELEKTROHYDRAULISCHE REGELEINHEIT | [2004/44] | English: | PRESSURE SENSOR INTEGRATED INTO AN ELECTRO-HYDRAULIC CONTROL UNIT | [2004/44] | French: | CAPTEUR DE PRESSION INTEGRE DANS UNE UNITE DE COMMANDE ELECTRIQUE ET HYDRAULIQUE | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 15.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2003 | AT | 30.03.2011 | BE | 30.03.2011 | CY | 30.03.2011 | CZ | 30.03.2011 | DK | 30.03.2011 | EE | 30.03.2011 | FI | 30.03.2011 | IT | 30.03.2011 | NL | 30.03.2011 | SE | 30.03.2011 | SI | 30.03.2011 | SK | 30.03.2011 | TR | 30.03.2011 | BG | 30.06.2011 | GR | 01.07.2011 | ES | 11.07.2011 | PT | 01.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
TR | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 30.03.2011 | |
GR | 01.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19514383 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1,10 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 44; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19652228 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2-5,8,9,18,19 * column 2, line 20 - column 2, line 36; figure . *; | [XY]EP1016573 (KELSEY HAYES CO [US]) [X] 1,2,10,11,19 * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 2; figure 4 * [Y] 3-5,12-14; | [Y]DE19940696 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [Y] 12-14* column 4, line 22 - column 4, line 37 *; | [X]DE19917941 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,10,19 * column 3, line 5 - column 3, line 47; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19916087 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [Y] 3-9,15-18 * column 1, line 13 - column 1, line 47 *; | [XY]DE10030250 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,2,10-14,19 * column 1, line 43 - column 3, line 16; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-9,15-18; | [XY]DE10037842 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,7,10,11,17 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 39; figure 4 * [Y] 2-5,8,9,12,14,18,19; | [PX]DE10122330 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [PX] 1,2,10,14,19 * column 5, line 30 - column 5, line 58; figures 3,6 * | by applicant | US20010851189 |