EP1476929 - HYBRID POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company One Gillette Park- 3E Boston, MA 02127 / US | [2012/23] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states THE GILLETTE COMPANY Prudential Tower Building Boston, Massachusetts 02199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURILKOV, Jordan, T. 14000 Bedford Street Apt. 4 Stamford, CT 06905 / US | 02 /
KLEIN, David, N. 122 Valley Stream Lane Southbury, CT 06488 / US | 03 /
ROTONDO, John 75 Toas Street Shelton, CT 06484 / US | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/47] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03707853.2 | 11.02.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003US04116 | Priority number, date | US20020077191 | 15.02.2002 Original published format: US 77191 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03071651 | Date: | 28.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1476929 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
H02J7/342 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDE STROMVERSORGUNG | [2004/47] | English: | HYBRID POWER SUPPLY | [2004/47] | French: | ALIMENTATION HYBRIDE | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 14.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/10] | 12.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5717308 (NISHITANI YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4-6,8-10,15,17-19 * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 11; figure 2 *; | [Y]US6154007 (SHAVER DAVID M [CA], et al) [Y] 1,4-6,8-10,15,17-19 * column 4, line 1 - line 50; figure 2 *; | [A]DE3525630 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |