EP1490653 - HAND-HELD LASER DISTANCE MEASURING DEVICE AND ACCESSORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/01] | DEVICE AND ACCESSORY | ||
[2017/16] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STIERLE, Joerg Beethovenstrasse 36 71111 Waldenbuch / DE | 02 /
WOLF, Peter Sandweg 23 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 03 /
RENZ, Kai Keltenstr. 6 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstr. 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03708004.1 | 24.01.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003DE00187 | Priority number, date | DE20021013434 | 26.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10213434 | [2005/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03081173 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1490653 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01C3/08, G01C15/00, // G01D11/24, G01C9/34 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
G01D11/24 (EP,US);
G01S17/08 (EP,US);
G01S7/4813 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | G01C3/08, G01D11/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | HANDGEHALTENES LASERENTFERNUNGSMESSGERÄT UND ZUBEHÖRTEIL | [2017/16] | English: | HAND-HELD LASER DISTANCE MEASURING DEVICE AND ACCESSORY | [2017/16] | French: | TÉLÉMÈTRE LASER TENU À LA MAIN ET ACCESSOIRE | [2017/16] |
Former [2005/01] | GERÄT UND ZUBEHÖRTEIL | ||
Former [2005/01] | DEVICE AND ACCESSORY | ||
Former [2005/01] | APPAREIL ET ACCESSOIRE | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 21.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 15.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0191978 (IMP SCHRADE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * Das ganze Dokument *; | [A]WO9808052 (LASER TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * Das ganze dokument *; | [A]EP1050793 (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1 * Das ganze Dokument *; | [A]US5260554 (GRODEVANT SCOTT R [US]) [A] 1 * Das ganze Dokument *; | [A]DE10016309 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * Das ganze Dokument * | Examination | DE19809683 | JP2001174292 |