EP1531310 - REFRIGERANT LEAK DETECTOR OF COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIE, Munehiro, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2005/20] | Representative(s) | O'Connell, David Christopher, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | O'Connell, David Christopher, et al HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03708533.9 | 10.03.2003 | [2005/20] | WO2003JP02817 | Priority number, date | JP20020238667 | 19.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002238667 | [2005/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004016998 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1531310 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F25B49/02 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
F25B49/005 (EP,US);
F25B2400/12 (EP,US);
F25B2500/19 (EP,US);
F25B2500/221 (EP,US);
F25B2500/222 (EP,US);
F25B2700/151 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/49] |
Former [2005/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KÄLTEMITTELLECKDETEKTOR FÜR KOMPRESSOR | [2005/20] | English: | REFRIGERANT LEAK DETECTOR OF COMPRESSOR | [2005/20] | French: | DETECTEUR DE FUITE DE CARBURANT D'UN COMPRESSEUR | [2005/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2004 | Translation filed | 29.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/39] | 11.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH07337081 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2001165552 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |