EP1491308 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING CERAMIC HONEYCOMB STRUCTURAL BODY, AND CERAMIC HONEYCOMB STRUCTURAL BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUTA, Ken c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
OTA, Tomoko c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03708619.6 | 14.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003JP03084 | Priority number, date | JP20020092433 | 28.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002092433 | [2005/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03082541 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1491308 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1491308 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B28B11/02, B01D39/20, F01N3/022, B28B11/08, C04B38/00 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
B01D46/0001 (EP,US);
B01D39/2068 (EP,US);
B28B11/006 (EP,US);
B01D2275/206 (EP,US);
B01D46/247 (EP,US);
B01D46/2484 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | B28B11/02, B01D39/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/09] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KERAMIKWABENSTRUKTURKÖRPERS UND KERAMIKWABENSTRUKTURKÖRPER | [2005/01] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING CERAMIC HONEYCOMB STRUCTURAL BODY, AND CERAMIC HONEYCOMB STRUCTURAL BODY | [2005/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN CORPS EN CERAMIQUE A STRUCTURE EN NID D'ABEILLES, ET CORPS EN CERAMIQUE A STRUCTURE EN NID D'ABEILLES | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2004 | Translation filed | 15.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 29.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 30.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002028915 ; | [A]US4557962 (BELMONTE JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]US4563414 (OGAWA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US5433904 (NOKY WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020503), vol. 2002, no. 05, & JP2002028915 A 20020129 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4559193 (OGAWA YUTAKA [JP], et al); | [A]JPH01192504 (IBIDEN CO LTD); | [A]JPH01259905 (IBIDEN CO LTD); | [A]JP2001300922 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [A]US2002020944 (YAMAGUCHI SATORU [JP], et al) |