EP1491192 - BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY-PROMOTING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SOYBEAN GERM-ORIGIN ISOFLAVONE AGLYCON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nichimo Co., Ltd 2-20, Higashi-shinagawa 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Nichimo Co., Ltd 2-20, Higashi-shinagawa 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEBE, Minoru, Nichimo Co., Ltd. 2-20, Higashishinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0001 / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2005/01] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd and Company, 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03708639.4 | 17.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003JP03157 | Priority number, date | JP20020072939 | 15.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002072939 | [2005/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03077904 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1491192 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/366, A61K35/78, A61P3/06, A61P5/30, A61P5/32, A61P7/00, A61P9/10, A61P19/10, A61P31/04, A61P35/00, A61P37/04, A61P39/06, A61P43/00, C07D311/36 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A23L11/50 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A61K31/366 (EP,US);
A61P1/06 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/30 (EP);
A61P5/32 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D311/36 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/366, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/30, A23V2250/21172 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | DIE BIOLOGISCHE WIRKUNG FÖRDERNDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT ISOFLAVON-AGKLYKON AUS SOJABOHNENKEIMEN | [2005/01] | English: | BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY-PROMOTING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SOYBEAN GERM-ORIGIN ISOFLAVONE AGLYCON | [2005/01] | French: | COMPOSITIONS RENFOR ANT L'ACTIVITE BIOLOGIQUE QUI CONTIENNENT UN AGLYCONE D'ISOFLAVONE ISSU DE GERMES DE SOJA | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2004 | Translation filed | 12.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 15.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/17] | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0922395 (NICHIMO KK [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2001010930 (OBATA AKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, paragraph 4; examples 1-3 * * page 1, paragraph 7 *; | [X] - KISHIDA T ET AL, "Soybean meal fermented by Aspergillus awamori increases the cytochrome P-450 content of the liver microsomes of mice.", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (2000 APR) VOL. 48, NO. 4, PP. 1367-72. JOURNAL CODE: 0374755. ISSN: 0021-8561., (200004), XP008079890 [X] 1 * page 1367, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 1371, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf9905830 | [PX] - PAN, WEIJUN [REPRINT AUTHOR] ET AL, "Effects of isoflavone aglycone on the prevention of obesity in a diet-induced obese mouse model.", FASEB JOURNAL, (MARCH 22, 2002) VOL. 16, NO. 5, PP. A1013. PRINT. MEETING INFO.: ANNUAL MEETING OF PROFESSIONAL RESEARCH SCIENTISTS ON EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY. NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA, USA. APRIL 20-24, 2002. CODEN: FAJOEC. ISSN: 0892-6638., (200203), XP008079886 [PX] 1 * the whole document * | [XP] - MIURA TAKEHITO ET AL, "Isoflavone aglycon produced by culture of soybean extracts with basidiomycetes and its anti-angiogenic activity.", BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND BIOCHEMISTRY DEC 2002, (200212), vol. 66, no. 12, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 2626 - 2631, XP002440873 [XP] 1 * page 2626, column R, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 2627, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 2630, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.66.2626 | International search | [X]JP2000281673 (NICHIMO KK, et al); | [X]JPH08214787 (NICHIMO KK, et al); | [A]EP0682877 (NICHIMO KK [JP], et al) |