EP1476219 - MAGNET CONTROL SYSTEM FOR BATTERY POWERED LIVING TISSUE STIMULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred E. Mann Foundation for Scientific Research P.O. Box 905 Santa Clarita, CA 91380 / US | [2004/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NELSON, Richard, J. 20216 Lakemore Drive Canyon Country, CA 91351 / US | 02 /
SCHULMANN, Joseph, H. 16050 Comet Way Santa Clarita, CA 91387 / US | 03 /
WALKER, Joseph, N. 18540 Soledad Canyon Road, Suite 38 Canyon Country, CA 91351 / US | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2004/47] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03709208.7 | 20.02.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003US05161 | Priority number, date | US20020080881 | 21.02.2002 Original published format: US 80881 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03072187 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1476219 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1476219 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/08, A61N1/372 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
A61N1/37252 (EP,US);
A61N1/37205 (EP,US);
A61N1/37217 (EP,US);
A61N1/37254 (EP,US);
A61N1/37264 (EP,US);
A61N1/3756 (EP,US);
A61N1/3787 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/47] | A61N1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2013/21] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MAGNETKONTROLLSYSTEM FÜR BATTERIEBETRIEBENE STIMULATOREN FÜR LEBENDES GEWEBE | [2004/47] | English: | MAGNET CONTROL SYSTEM FOR BATTERY POWERED LIVING TISSUE STIMULATORS | [2004/47] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE D'AIMANT POUR STIMULATEURS DE TISSUS VIVANTS A PILES | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 22.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5292342 (NELSON GARY E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,25,28,30-32 * column 8, line 60 - column 14, line 39; figure -; claim 1 * [A] 4,9,15,26,29; | [XA]US5722998 (PRUTCHI DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,19,20,23,24,30,31,37,38 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 37; figure - * * column 3, line 53 - column 5, line 53; figure - *[A] 4,6,9,10,21,22,25-28 | International search | [X]US5292342 (NELSON GARY E [US], et al); | [Y]US5722998 (PRUTCHI DAVID [US], et al) | by applicant | US6164284 | US6208894 | US6315721 | US6185452 |