EP1487478 - INTERFERON BETA-LIKE MOLECULES FOR TREATMENT OF STROKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maxygen Aps Agern Allé 1 2970 Hoersholm / DK | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLAZER, Steven Tagensvej 36, 5 th. DK-2200 Copenhagen N. / DK | 02 /
SAGER, Thomas Stormosevej 35 DK-2765 Smorum / DK | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Salka, Jeffrey, et al Maxygen ApS Agern Allé 1 Danish Science Park 2970 Hoersholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Salka, Jeffrey, et al Maxygen ApS, Agern Allé 1, Danish Science Park 2970 Hoersholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 03709664.1 | 28.02.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003DK00127 | Priority number, date | DK20020000371 | 12.03.2002 Original published format: DK 200200371 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03075944 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1487478 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/21 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
A61K38/21 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | AL | 12.10.2004 | LT | 12.10.2004 | LV | 12.10.2004 | MK | 12.10.2004 | RO | 12.10.2004 | Title | German: | INTERFERON BETA-ARTIGE MOLEKÜLE ZUR BEHANDLUNG DES SCHLAGANFALLS | [2004/52] | English: | INTERFERON BETA-LIKE MOLECULES FOR TREATMENT OF STROKE | [2004/52] | French: | MOLECULES DE TYPE INTERFERON BETA DESTINEES AU TRAITEMENT DES ACCIDENTS VASCULAIRES CEREBRAUX | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 29.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/09] | 11.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09151137 ; | [X]EP0797998 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-46 * column 5, line 1 - line 2 * * column 5, line 30 - line 35 *; | [PX]WO02080959 (UNIV MEDISCH CENTRUM UTRECHT [NL], et al) [PX] 1-46 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO02080976 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-46 * page 23, line 30 * * page 14, line 6 - line 10; claim 33 *; | [PA]WO02080953 (UNIV MEDISCH CENTRUM UTRECHT [NL], et al) [PA] 1-46 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO02089828 (INST OF MOLECUL & CELL BIOLOGY [SG], et al) [PX] 1-46 * abstract *; | [PX] - HAIPING LIU ET AL, "Interferon-Beta administration confers a beneficial outcome in a rabbit model of thromboembolic cerebral ischemia", NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, (20020719), vol. 327, no. 2, pages 146 - 148, XP002265673 [PX] 1-46 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3940(02)00371-3 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09151137 A 19970610 (TORAY IND INC) [A] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - WOUTER B VELDHUIS, "Delayed treatment with interferon-beta protects against ischemic stroke", STROKE, (200201), vol. 33, page 346, XP002265895 [X] 1-46 * the whole document * |