EP1469744 - NIXTAMALIZED CORN FLOUR PROCESS AND APPARATUS IMPROVEMENT FOR RECOVERING HEAT AND REDUCING PARTICULATE EMISSION FROM WASTE HOT AIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Investigación De Tecnologia Avanzada, S.A. DE C.V. Ave Ruiz Cortines S/N Frente a Colonia la Purisima Entre Gral. Bonifacio Salinas y Carretera Miguel Aleman Guadalupe, N.L. México C.P. 67110 / MX | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Investigación De Tecnologia Avanzada, S.A. DE C.V. Ave Ruiz Cortines S/N Frente a colonia la Purisima Entre Gral. Bonifacio Salinas y Carretera Migual Aleman Guadalupe, N.L. México C.P. 67110 / MX | ||
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Gonzalez Barrera, Roberto Lomas de Chapultepec Delegacion Miquel Hidalgo, MX 11000 / MX | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUBIO, Manuel, J. 1621 Collins Avenue Miami Beach, FL 33139 / US | 02 /
CONTRERAS, Roberto R. Cortines 2002 Ote Guadalupe, N.L. 67110 / MX | 03 /
SOSA, Francisco R. Cortines 2002 Ote Guadalupe, N.L. 67110 / MX | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03710794.3 | 31.01.2003 | [2004/44] | WO2003US02756 | Priority number, date | US20020059331 | 31.01.2002 Original published format: US 59331 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03063594 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1469744 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1469744 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/00, A23L1/10, A23L1/164, A21D8/00, A21D2/02 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
B02C11/08 (EP,US);
A23L7/10 (GB);
A23L7/13 (EP,US);
A23L7/1975 (EP,US);
A23L7/198 (EP,US);
B02B1/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/44] | A23L1/00 | Designated contracting states | IT [2006/47] |
Former [2004/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NIXTAMALISIERTES MAISMEHLVERFAHREN UND GERÄTSCHAFTLICHE VERBESSERUNG FÜR DIE WIEDERGEWINNUNG VON WÄRME UND VERRINGERUNG DER TEILCHENFÖRMIGEN EMISSIONEN VON HEISSER ABLUFT | [2004/44] | English: | NIXTAMALIZED CORN FLOUR PROCESS AND APPARATUS IMPROVEMENT FOR RECOVERING HEAT AND REDUCING PARTICULATE EMISSION FROM WASTE HOT AIR | [2004/44] | French: | AMELIORATION DE PROCEDE ET DE DISPOSITIF POUR L'ELABORATION DE FARINE DE MAIS NIXTAMALISEE, PERMETTANT LA RECUPERATION DE CHALEUR ET LA REDUCTION DES EMISSIONS DE PARTICULES DANS LES REJETS D'AIR CHAUD | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 09.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 22.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4594260 (VAQUEIRO M CRISTINA [MX], et al); | [A]US5447742 (MALVIDO OSCAR F [MX], et al); | [A]EP0883999 (SHORT MILLING CO J [US]) | International search | [Y]US5176931 (HERBSTER JEFFREY C [US]); | [Y]US5558898 (SUNDERLAND ROBERT D [US]); | [Y]US6322836 (RUBIO MANUEL J [US], et al) |