EP1472216 - NOVEL BICYCLIC HYDROXAMATES AS INHIBITORS OF HISTONE DEACETYLASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axys Pharmaceuticals 180 Kimball Way So. San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2004/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEAHY, Ellen M. 1185 Camellia Court San Leandro, CA 94577 / US | 02 /
VERNER, ERIK J. 709 Catamaran Street 1 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03710929.5 | 07.02.2003 | [2004/45] | WO2003US03846 | Priority number, date | US20020355700P | 07.02.2002 Original published format: US 355700 P | [2004/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03066579 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1472216 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C259/10 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
C07D213/81 (EP,US);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C259/10 (EP,US);
C07C275/42 (EP,US);
C07C311/08 (EP,US);
C07C311/13 (EP,US);
C07C311/21 (EP,US);
C07C311/29 (EP,US);
C07D207/16 (EP,US);
C07D209/14 (EP,US);
C07D209/16 (EP,US);
C07D209/18 (EP,US);
C07D211/16 (EP,US);
C07D211/22 (EP,US);
C07D211/46 (EP,US);
C07D211/60 (EP,US);
C07D211/62 (EP,US);
C07D213/38 (EP,US);
C07D213/56 (EP,US);
C07D213/65 (EP,US);
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
C07D233/64 (EP,US);
C07D235/18 (EP,US);
C07D295/108 (EP,US);
C07D295/135 (EP,US);
C07D295/155 (EP,US);
C07D295/192 (EP,US);
C07D307/68 (EP,US);
C07D317/58 (EP,US);
C07D317/60 (EP,US);
C07D317/68 (EP,US);
C07D333/24 (EP,US);
C07D333/38 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C12Q1/34 (EP,US);
C12Q1/37 (EP,US);
C12Q1/48 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/45] | C07C259/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/45] | Extension states | AL | 29.07.2004 | LT | 29.07.2004 | LV | 29.07.2004 | MK | 29.07.2004 | RO | 29.07.2004 | Title | German: | NEUE BICYCLISCHE HYDROXAMSÄUREN ALS HEMMER DER HISTON DEACETYLASE | [2004/45] | English: | NOVEL BICYCLIC HYDROXAMATES AS INHIBITORS OF HISTONE DEACETYLASE | [2004/45] | French: | NOUVEAUX HYDROXAMATES BICYCLIQUES SERVANT D'INHIBITEURS DE HISTONE DESACETYLASE | [2004/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 02.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/36] | 18.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1078917 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1 * page 308: example 22; page 311: example 22(5); page 312: examples 22(6) and 22(7); page 313: examples 22(8) and 22(9); page 317: example 25 *; | [X]EP0067511 (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 1 * page 6: compound 26 *; | [X]US3903083 (SHEN TSUNG-YING, et al) [X] 1 * column 3: lines 37-38; column 4, lines 13-20 and Table 1: examples 2 and 3 *; | [A]WO0170675 (METHYLGENE INC [CA]) [A] 1,11,14,15,17,18 * the whole document * | [X] - PYRIADI T M ET AL, "ANIONIC RING-OPENING POLYMERIZATION OF SEVERAL N-SUBSTITUTED DIPHENIMIDES", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, JOHN WILEY AND SONS. NEW YORK, US, (19931201), vol. 31, no. 13, ISSN 0360-6376, pages 3199 - 3203, XP000415132 [X] 1 * page 3200, Table I: 5th entry * | [X] - FOKS H ET AL, "STUDIES ON PYRAZINE DERIVATIVES PART X. SYNTHESIS AND TUBERCULOSTATIC ACTIVITY OF SOME 6-CYCLAMINO-6-IMIDAZOLYL- AND TRIAZOLYLPYRAZINE-2CARBOXYLIC ACIDS DERIVATIVES", POLISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND PHARMACY, POLISH ACADEMY OF SCIENCES INSTITUTE OF, PL, (1978), vol. 30, no. 1, ISSN 0301-0244, pages 105 - 111, XP008016993 [X] 1 * page 107: compound 7; page 108: compound 15; page 110: last 5 lines * | [X] - THUNUS, L. ET AL, "(4-Methyl-1-piperazinyl) pyridine dimethylsulfonamide derivatives", ANNALES PHARMACEUTIQUES FRANCAISES ( 1974 ), 32(11), 569-74, XP008020035 [X] 1 * page 571, Table 1: compound LT291; page 574: lines 11-20 * |