EP1539010 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RESECTING AND REMOVING SELECTED BODY TISSUE FROM A SITE INSIDE A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spiration, Inc. 6675 185th Avenue N.E. Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2005/30] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Spiration, Inc. 18109 Northeast 76th Street Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRY, Robert, Lawrence 13608-88th PI NE Kiskland, WA 98033 / US | 02 /
DEVORE, Lauri, J. 17036-13th Ave NE Seattle, WA 98155 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03711272.9 | 26.02.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US05921 | Priority number, date | US20020146444 | 14.05.2002 Original published format: US 146444 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03096886 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1539010 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
A61B18/1482 (EP,US);
A61B10/02 (EP,US);
A61B10/0283 (EP,US);
A61B17/32056 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00809 (EP,US);
A61B2017/306 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00029 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00541 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00601 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR RESEKTION UND ENTFERNUNG VON AUSGEWÄHLTEM KÖRPERGEWEBE AUS EINER STELLE IM KÖRPER EINES PATIENTEN | [2005/24] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RESECTING AND REMOVING SELECTED BODY TISSUE FROM A SITE INSIDE A PATIENT | [2005/24] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE RESEQUER UN TISSU CORPOREL CHOISI ET DE LE RETRANCHER D'UN ENDROIT SITUE A L'INTERIEUR D'UN PATIENT | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9003152 (CONSIDINE JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 1,18 * pages 7-9 *; | [X]US5197963 (PARINS DAVID J [US]) [X] 1,4-8,11,13-15,18 * column 3, lines 47-68; figure 3 *; | [X]WO9808441 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY [US]) [X] 1,4-11,13-16,18 * page 11, line 11 - page 13, line 25 *; | [XA]US5797907 (CLEMENT THOMAS P [US]) [X] 1,4-8,11,14,15,18 * columns 4-6 *[A] 2,3,9,10,12,13,16,17; | [X]US5810809 (RYDELL MARK A [US]) [X] 1,4-8,10,11,13-15,18 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 14 *; | [X]US6090041 (CLARK ORLO H [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,16-18 * columns 5-9; figure 12a *; | [X]US6102885 (BASS LAWRENCE S [US]) [X] 1,4-8,18 * column 6, line 57 - column 8, line 34; claim 1 * | International search | [A]US5810806 (RITCHART MARK A [US], et al) |