EP1468346 - CONTROL UNIT WITH THREE PARALLEL BRANCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | [2006/33] |
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOSSELIN, Florian 1 Square Augustin Pajou 92260 Fontenay aux Roses / FR | 02 /
VILLEDIEU, Eric Résidence les Faurys, 2, rue du Val d'Orient 13770 Venelles / FR | 03 /
FRICONNEAU, Jean-Pierre 34, rue Mansart 78330 Fontenay le Fleury / FR | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/43] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Société BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03712266.0 | 20.01.2003 | [2004/43] | WO2003FR00170 | Priority number, date | FR20020000755 | 22.01.2002 Original published format: FR 0200755 | [2004/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03062939 | Date: | 31.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1468346 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1468346 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05G9/047, B25J17/02 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
B25J13/02 (EP,US);
B25J17/0266 (EP,US);
G05G9/04737 (EP,US);
G06F3/0346 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20305 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] |
Former [2004/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEDIENELEMENT MIT DREI PARALLELEN ARMEN | [2004/43] | English: | CONTROL UNIT WITH THREE PARALLEL BRANCHES | [2004/43] | French: | ORGANE DE COMMANDE A TROIS BRANCHES PARALLELES | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 28.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2006 | CY | 16.08.2006 | CZ | 16.08.2006 | EE | 16.08.2006 | FI | 16.08.2006 | IE | 16.08.2006 | NL | 16.08.2006 | SI | 16.08.2006 | SK | 16.08.2006 | TR | 16.08.2006 | BG | 16.11.2006 | DK | 16.11.2006 | SE | 16.11.2006 | GR | 17.11.2006 | ES | 27.11.2006 | PT | 16.01.2007 | LU | 20.01.2007 | BE | 31.01.2007 | CH | 31.01.2007 | FR | 31.01.2007 | LI | 31.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | HU | 17.02.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CY | 16.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
EE | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
LU | 20.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2007 | ||
FR | 31.01.2007 | ||
LI | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
EE | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2007 | ||
FR | 31.01.2007 | ||
LI | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2007 | ||
FR | 31.01.2007 | ||
LI | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2007 | ||
LI | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2007 | ||
LI | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2007 | ||
LI | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000181618 ; | [A]EP0540197 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK [GB]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 13 * * claims 1-3 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9504959 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000181618 A 20000630 (MITSUBISHI PRECISION CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | - http://intron.kz.tsukuba.ac.jp/HM/txt.html | - CLEARY AND BROOKS, "Kinematic analysis of a novel 6-DOF parallel manipulator.", CLEARY AND BROOKS, CLEARY AND BROOKS, IEEE, (1993), pages 708 - 713, doi:doi:10.1109/ROBOT.1993.292061, XP000410248 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.1993.292061 | - WOO, JIN AND KWON, "A 6-DOF force-refelecting hand controller using the fivebar parallel mechanism.", Proceedings of the IEEE, International Conference on Robotics & Automation., BELGIUM, LOUVAIN, (199805), pages 1597 - 1601 |