EP1490803 - PRODUCT SELECTION, COMMERCIAL AND GENERAL ARRANGEMENT INTEGRATED APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AES Engineering Ltd Mill Close, Bradmarsh Business Park Rotherham S60 1BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states AES Engineering Ltd Mill Close, Bradmarsh Business Park Rotherham S60 1BZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILKINSON, Jonathan 8 Geary Close Alverthorpe, Wakefield WF2 0UL / GB | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03712367.6 | 17.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003GB01162 | Priority number, date | GB20020006338 | 18.03.2002 Original published format: GB 0206338 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03079185 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1490803 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06F30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE APPLIKATION ZUR PRODUKTAUSWAHL UND ZU KOMMERZIELLEM UND ALLGEMEINEM ARRANGEMENT | [2005/01] | English: | PRODUCT SELECTION, COMMERCIAL AND GENERAL ARRANGEMENT INTEGRATED APPLICATION | [2005/01] | French: | APPLICATION INTEGREE DE SELECTION DE PRODUIT, D'INFORMATION COMMERCIALE SUR LE PRODUIT, ET DE DESSIN DONNANT UNE REPRESENTATION GENERALE DU PRODUIT | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 23.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10008017 (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-44 * abstract * * column 10, lines 8-27 * * figure 6 *; | US2003144756 [ ] (KOEHLER ULRICH [DE], et al); | [X]WO0116812 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-44; | EP1225522 [ ] (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] - [0039] - [0054] * * figures 1,6,24 *; | [A]EP0801355 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [A] 1-44 * abstract * * figures 9,10 *; | [A]EP0314596 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-44 * abstract * * figures 6,7 * * figure 13 *; | [A]US6052669 (SMITH WARD W [US], et al) [A] 1-44 * abstract * * figures 13,15 *; | [A] - KROLL J, "FINDEN STATT SUCHEN MULTIMEDIA-DATENBANK FUR ELEKTRONISCHE BAUTEILE: DER KATALOG AUF CD FEIERT PREMIERE", ELEKTRONIK, FRANZIS VERLAG GMBH. MUNCHEN, DE, (19941004), vol. 43, no. 20, ISSN 0013-5658, pages 92 - 94,96-98, XP000445340 [A] 1-44 * abstract * * figures 6,7 * | [A] - JAIDEEP AHLUWALIA ET AL, "COMPUTER-AIDED OPTIMUM SELECTION OF ROLLER BEARINGS", COMPUTER AIDED DESIGN, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (19930801), vol. 25, no. 8, ISSN 0010-4485, pages 493 - 499, XP000385103 [A] 1-44 * abstract * * page 494, column 1, paragraph 6 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0010-4485(93)90080-8 |